MEDLINE INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS, L.P. et al v. PHILADELPHIA ACADEMIC HEALTH HOLDINGS, LLC
Plaintiff: MEDLINE INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS, L.P. and MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA ACADEMIC HEALTH HOLDINGS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv03108
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MEDLINE INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS, L.P., MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC.. All Defendants served on 7/24/19 and answer due 9/23/19. (ANGELICH, GEORGE) Modified on 7/31/2019 (lvj, ).
July 22, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to PHILADELPHIA ACADEMIC HEALTH HOLDINGS, LLC. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/22/2019 (amas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PHILADELPHIA ACADEMIC HEALTH HOLDINGS, LLC, filed by MEDLINE INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS, L.P., MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC..(amas )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL, NO LATER THAN 7/25/2019, EITHER FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT PLEADING THE PARTIES' CITIZENSHIP, OR SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS THEIR CASE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/18/2019. 7/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(amas)
July 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MEDLINE INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS, L.P., MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC.. (ahf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MEDLINE INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS, L.P., MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC..(ahf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE PETER ANGELICH on behalf of MEDLINE INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS, L.P., MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC. (ahf)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to PHILADELPHIA ACADEMIC HEALTH HOLDINGS, LLC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/17/2019 (ahf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILADELPHIA ACADEMIC HEALTH HOLDINGS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200575.), filed by MEDLINE INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS, L.P., MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEDLINE INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS, L.P. et al v. PHILADELPHIA ACADEMIC HEALTH HOLDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDLINE INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS, L.P.
Represented By: GEORGE PETER ANGELICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: GEORGE PETER ANGELICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA ACADEMIC HEALTH HOLDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?