REED et al v. BERNARD et al
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND and MERRY REED
Defendant: SHERIFF JEWELL WILLIAMS, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, SHEILA BEDFORD, JAMES O'BRIEN, ROBERT STACK, PRESIDENT JUDGE PATRICK DUGAN and JANE RICE
Case Number: 2:2019cv03110
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A CONSOLIDATED BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS #12 ON OR BEFORE 10/9/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/10/19. 9/11/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN J. MCGRATH on behalf of JEWELL WILLIAMS with Certificate of Service(MCGRATH, SEAN)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS on behalf of SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK with Certiicate of Service(DAVIS, MEGAN)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK.Brief in Support and Certificate of Service.(DALEY, MICHAEL)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT JEWELL WILLIAMS HAS UNTIL 9/18/19 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/3/19. 9/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY MARIE KIRBY on behalf of JEWELL WILLIAMS with Certificate of Service(KIRBY, AMY)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ROBERT D. FRIEDMAN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/26/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO FRIEDMAN. (fdc)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF NICOLAS Y. RILEY, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/26/19.8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO RILEY. (fdc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert D. Friedman ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13753689.) filed by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED.Certificate of Service.(SAFIER, PAUL)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Nicolas Y. Riley ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13753665.) filed by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED.Certificate of Service.(SAFIER, PAUL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED re #1 Complaint, Summons Issued served on defendant Sheriff Jewell Williams (BERRY, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED re #1 Complaint, Summons Issued served on defendants Arraignment Court Magistrate Judges Francis Bernard, Sheila Bedford, Kevin Devlin, James O'Brien, Jane Rice, and Robert Stack, and President Judge Patrick Dugan (SAFIER, PAUL)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL J. SAFIER on behalf of PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED (SAFIER, PAUL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND.(ahf)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK, JEWELL WILLIAMS. 8 Given To: Counsel on 7/17/2019 (ahf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK, JEWELL WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200577.), filed by MERRY REED, PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REED et al v. BERNARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF JEWELL WILLIAMS
Represented By: SEAN J. MCGRATH
Represented By: AMY MARIE KIRBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS BERNARD
Represented By: MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL DALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN DEVLIN
Represented By: MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL DALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHEILA BEDFORD
Represented By: MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES O'BRIEN
Represented By: MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL DALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT STACK
Represented By: MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL DALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESIDENT JUDGE PATRICK DUGAN
Represented By: MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL DALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE RICE
Represented By: MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL DALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND
Represented By: MICHAEL BERRY
Represented By: ROBERT D. FRIEDMAN
Represented By: NICOLAS Y. RILEY
Represented By: PAUL J. SAFIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERRY REED
Represented By: MICHAEL BERRY
Represented By: ROBERT D. FRIEDMAN
Represented By: NICOLAS Y. RILEY
Represented By: PAUL J. SAFIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?