BLAKE v. GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC
Plaintiff: KATHRYN BLAKE
Defendant: GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv03116
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAMA K. WILTSHIRE on behalf of GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC with Certificate of Service(WILTSHIRE, ADAMA)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including GH Healthcare with Certificate of Service by GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC.(LEAHY, WILLIAM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant General Healthcare Resources, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC.(LEAHY, WILLIAM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. LEAHY on behalf of GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC with Certificate of Service(LEAHY, WILLIAM)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING THE DEFENDANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL SEPTEMBER 10, 2019 IN WHICH TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 08/22/2019. 08/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KATHRYN BLAKE re: Jeff Brown served Summons and Complaint upon GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC by Personal. GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (DION, SAMUEL)
July 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KATHRYN BLAKE. (ahf)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/18/2019 (ahf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200581.), filed by KATHRYN BLAKE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLAKE v. GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN BLAKE
Represented By: SAMUEL A. DION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL HEALTHCARE RESOURCES, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM J. LEAHY
Represented By: ADAMA K. WILTSHIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?