LEACH v. PPS PHILA PRISON SYSTEM
Plaintiff: KEVIN LEACH
Defendant: PPS PHILA PRISON SYSTEM
Case Number: 2:2019cv03233
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 PLAINTIFF LOCATED IN CFCF FROM PHILADELPHIA PRISON SYSTEM INMATE LOCATOR AND FORWARDED MEMO/ORDER TO NEW ADDDRESS. (jaa, ) Modified on 9/10/2019 (jaa, ).
August 20, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated 7/29/19 (Document #4 and 5 ) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to KEVIN LEACH for the following reason: RETURN TO SENDER. (jaa, ) Modified on 8/21/2019 (jaa, ).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.&1915 (e)(2)(B)(ii); ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/29/19. 7/30/19 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE WITH FORMS. (JL)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/29/19. 7/30/19 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE WITH FORMS.(jl, )
July 25, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KEVIN LEACH. (ahf)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against PPS PHILA PRISON SYSTEM, filed by KEVIN LEACH. (NO ENVELOPE INCLUDED).(ahf)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY KEVIN LEACH.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEACH v. PPS PHILA PRISON SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN LEACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPS PHILA PRISON SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?