LIVING ASSISTANCE SERVICES, INC. v. BALL et al
Plaintiff: LIVING ASSISTANCE SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: CASEY BALL HOME CARE, LLC and CASEY BALL
Case Number: 2:2019cv03236
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry/Report of Telephone Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE and counsel on 8/22/19. (kw, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/4/19 before Judge Rufe. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT PENDING FINALIZATION OF AN AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES AS TO THE TERMS OF THE POST-TERMINATION OBLIGATIONS OF DEFENDANTS UNDER FRANCHISE AGREEMENT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT A STATUS REPORT TO THE COURT WITHIN 14 DAYS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/4/19.9/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/5/2019) (mbh, ).
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CASEY BALL, CASEY BALL HOME CARE, LLC. (SHEILS, ROBERT)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with,Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim to Verified Complaint for Injunction and Other Relief , COUNTERCLAIM against LIVING ASSISTANCE SERVICES, INC. by CASEY BALL HOME CARE, LLC, CASEY BALL.(SHEILS, ROBERT)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JOHN P. CORCORAN, JR., ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/27/19. 8/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John P. Corcoran Jr. by CASEY BALL, CASEY BALL, CASEY BALL HOME CARE, LLC, CASEY BALL HOME CARE, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13764381.). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SHEILS, ROBERT)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A HEARING WILL BE HELD ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ON 9/4/2019 AT 2:00 PM IN COURTROOM 12-A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/22/19. 8/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION IS EXTENDED TO 8/30/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/21/19. 8/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON 8/22/2019 AT 3:30 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/13/19. 8/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNEPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ).
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LIVING ASSISTANCE SERVICES, INC... (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(BUKOWSKI, JEFFREY)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LIVING ASSISTANCE SERVICES, INC. re: Guy Rubel served Summons and Complaint upon CASEY BALL by Personal Service. CASEY BALL served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (BUKOWSKI, JEFFREY)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LIVING ASSISTANCE SERVICES, INC. re: Guy Rubel served Summons and Complaint upon CASEY BALL HOME CARE, LLC by Personal Service upon Owner. CASEY BALL HOME CARE, LLC served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (BUKOWSKI, JEFFREY)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LIVING ASSISTANCE SERVICES, INC..(ahf) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/30/2019) (nd, ).
July 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to CASEY BALL, CASEY BALL HOME CARE, LLC. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/25/2019 (ahf)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CASEY BALL, CASEY BALL HOME CARE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200983.), filed by LIVING ASSISTANCE SERVICES, INC..(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIVING ASSISTANCE SERVICES, INC. v. BALL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASEY BALL HOME CARE, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT P. SHEILS, III
Represented By: JOHN P CORCORAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASEY BALL
Represented By: ROBERT P. SHEILS, III
Represented By: JOHN P CORCORAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIVING ASSISTANCE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY D. BUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?