ELANSARI v. ALTRIA et al
Plaintiff: AMRO ELANSARI
Defendant: JAPAN TOBACCO, ALTRIA, BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO and IMPERIAL TOBACCO
Case Number: 2:2019cv03415
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #7 Notice of Appeal filed by AMRO ELANSARI. USCA Case Number 19-3177 (ke)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order Dismissing Case by AMRO ELANSARI. IFP GRANTED Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk (nd, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLFF'S CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/6/19. 9/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
August 2, 2019 Blank copy of Court's form complaint mailed to pro se plff on 8/5/19. (kw, )
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED, ETC. MR. ELANSARI'S COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. MR. ELANSARI MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 9/3/2019, ETC. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT DIRECT SERVICE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND MR. ELANSARI A BLANK COPY OF THE COURT'S FORM COMPLAINT TO BE USED BY A PRO SE PLFF BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/2/19. 8/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/2/19. 8/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
July 30, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AMRO ELANSARI. (jwl, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ALTRIA, BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO, IMPERIAL TOBACCO, JAPAN TOBACCO, filed by AMRO ELANSARI. NO ENVELOPE.(jwl, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by AMRO ELANSARI..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELANSARI v. ALTRIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAPAN TOBACCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPERIAL TOBACCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMRO ELANSARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?