MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC v. RICOH USA, INC.
Plaintiff: MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC
Defendant: RICOH USA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03423
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 183
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION IS GRANTED AND GEOFFREY KIRKLAND GAVIN IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT RICOH USA, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/16/19. 9/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION IS GRANTED AND JOSHUA RYAN NIGHTINGALE IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT RICOH USA, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/16/19. 9/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION IS GRANTED AND LISA LYNN FURBY IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT RICOH USA, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/16/19. 9/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION IS GRANTED AND TRACY ANN STITT IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT RICOH USA, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/16/19. 9/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION IS GRANTED AND RYAN KERRICK WALSH IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BART OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT RICOH USA, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/16/19. 9/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey Kirkland Gavin, Esq. by RICOH USA, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13795241.). (LECHTMAN, EVAN)
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Ryan Nightingale, Esq. by RICOH USA, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13795232.). (LECHTMAN, EVAN)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa Lynn Furby by RICOH USA, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13795221.). (LECHTMAN, EVAN)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tracy Ann Stitt, Esq. by RICOH USA, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13795200.). (LECHTMAN, EVAN)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Kerrick Walsh, Esq. by RICOH USA, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13795171.). (LECHTMAN, EVAN)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by RICOH USA, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(LECHTMAN, EVAN) Modified on 9/4/2019 (tjd).
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT DEFENDANT RICOH USA, INC'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DOC. NO. #7 ) AND PLAINTIFF MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC'S MOTION TO FILE SUPPORTING EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL (DOC. NO. #10 ) ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/26/2019. 8/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/26/2019. 8/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBITS 1-9 TO THE DECLARATION OF PAUL J. ANDRE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BRIEF. *FILED UNDER SEAL. (jaa, ) (fb, ).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ACTIONS AT CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-514 AND CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-3423 ARE CONSOLIDATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/21/19.8/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 to 9 to the Declaration of Paul J. Andre in Support of Reply Brief filed by MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Seal Documents, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ANDRE, PAUL)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MASA's Reply Brief in Further Support of Its Motion to Consolidate filed by MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Andre In Support of MASA's Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(ANDRE, PAUL)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBITS 2 THROUGH 5 TO RICHOH USA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. *FILED UNDER SEAL. (jaa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2019: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document) (lisad, ).
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Document UNREDACTED SUPPORTING EXHIBITS TO RICOH USA'S OPPOSITION TO MASAS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (UNOPPOSED) filed by RICOH USA, INC... (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LECHTMAN, EVAN)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by RICOH USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Evan Lechtman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(LECHTMAN, EVAN)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT THE DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE NO LATER THAN AUGUST 19, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/15/19. 8/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC.Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Consolidate, #2 Declaration of Paul Andre in Support of Motion to Consolidate, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ANDRE, PAUL)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC re: Sean Glynn served Summons and Complaint upon RICOH USA, INC.. RICOH USA, INC. served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (ANDRE, PAUL)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent MIDWEST YOUTH A & S, INC. for MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC. by MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC.(amas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICOH USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 201229.), filed by MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H PART 1, #9 Exhibit H PART 2, #10 Exhibit H PART 3, #11 Exhibit H PART 4, #12 Exhibit H PART 5, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J PART 1, #15 Exhibit J PART 2, #16 Exhibit J PART 3, #17 Exhibit K, #18 Exhibit L, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)
July 30, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC. (amas)
July 30, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to RICOH USA, INC.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/31/2019 (amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC v. RICOH USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICOH USA, INC.
Represented By: RYAN K. WALSH
Represented By: TRACY A. STITT
Represented By: JOSHUA RYAN NIGHTINGALE
Represented By: EVAN LECHTMAN
Represented By: GEOFFREY KIRKLAND GAVIN
Represented By: LISA LYNN FURBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIDWEST ATHLETICS AND SPORTS ALLIANCE LLC
Represented By: PAUL J. ANDRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?