IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF THOMAS ADDIS, AS OWNER OF A 1988 30 FT. SILVERTOWN MOTOR YACHT, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS ADDIS
Defendant: MEDICALLY NECESSARY, HULL IDENTIFICATION NUMBER NTLB5661A585
In Re: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF THOMAS ADDIS, AS OWNER OF A 1988 30 FT. SILVERTOWN MOTOR YACHT, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv03451
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0183
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY. (ems)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ACCEPT THE FUNDS TENDERED TO THE COURT AS DESCRIBED ABOVE AND THAT SUCH TENDER SATISFIES THE SECURITY REQUIREMENTS OF 46 U.S.C. SECTION 30511 AND SUPPLEMENTAL RULE F(1) INCLUSIVE OF INTEREST AND COSTS NOT PREVIOUSLY STIPULATED TO BY THE LIMITATION PLAINTIFF IN THIS MATTER, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE RIGHT OF ANY CLAIMANT TO SEEK ADDITIONAL SECURITY UNDER SUPPLEMENTAL RULE F(7). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 8/16/2019. 8/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF PUBLICATION AND STAY AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 8/16/2019. 8/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JUSTIN G. GUTHRIE, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 8/7/19.8/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 8/9/19) (kw, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHRISTOPHER A. ABEL, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 8/7/19. 8/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL WITH ECF APPLICTION AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christopher A. Abel ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13718676.) filed by THOMAS ADDIS, Statement, Certificate of Service.(LEVAN, JENNIFER) Modified on 8/13/2019 (md).
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Justin G. Guthrie ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13718633.) filed by THOMAS ADDIS, Statement, Certificate of Service.(LEVAN, JENNIFER) Modified on 8/13/2019 (md).
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Publication filed by THOMAS ADDIS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Notice)(LEVAN, JENNIFER) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/9/2019, per chambers approval) (md, ). Modified on 8/9/2019 (md).
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MEDICALLY NECESSARY, HULL IDENTIFICATION NUMBER NTLB5661A585 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE201297.), filed by THOMAS ADDIS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF THOMAS ADDIS, AS OWNER OF A 1988 30 FT. SILVERTOWN MOTOR YACHT, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICALLY NECESSARY, HULL IDENTIFICATION NUMBER NTLB5661A585
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS ADDIS
Represented By: JENNIFER L. LEVAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. ABEL
Represented By: JUSTIN G. GUTHRIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF THOMAS ADDIS, AS OWNER OF A 1988 30 FT. SILVERTOWN MOTOR YACHT, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?