PIAZZA v. LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC
Plaintiff: ANNETTE PIAZZA
Defendant: LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv03453
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/23/19 (jaa, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 27, 2019, COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES SHALL CONTACT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET TO SCHEDULE A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/20/2019. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 12/11/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/23/19. 9/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan by LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC.(LITVIN, CAREN) Modified on 9/17/2019 (tjd).
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC.(LITVIN, CAREN)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/23/2019 03:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANNETTE PIAZZA re: Thomas J. Crean served Summons and Complaint upon LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC by Personal. LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (WEINBERG, MARC)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC.(LITVIN, CAREN)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CAREN LITVIN on behalf of LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC with Certificate of Service(LITVIN, CAREN)
July 31, 2019 Demand for Trial by Jury.(mbh, )
July 31, 2019 (1) Summons Issued as to LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC. Forwarded To: counsel on 8/1/19 (mbh, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE201301)filed by ANNETTE PIAZZA.(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PIAZZA v. LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNETTE PIAZZA
Represented By: MARC A. WEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCKY VITAMIN, LLC
Represented By: CAREN LITVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?