SANCHEZ v. JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Plaintiff: ALTAGRACIA SANCHEZ
Defendant: JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv03553
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN J. DEVINE on behalf of ALTAGRACIA SANCHEZ with Certificate of Service(DEVINE, STEPHEN)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Praecipe to Attach Verification by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (BAXTER, PATRICIA)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (BAXTER, PATRICIA) Modified on 9/30/2019 (tjd).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 27, 2019, DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER ASSERTING ONLY THOSE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FOR WHICH IT HAS A GOOD FAITH BASIS' AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 10/4/2019. DISCOVERY DUE BY 12/20/2019. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 1/10/2020. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/15/2020. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/15/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/20/19. 9/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 9/23/2019 (tjd).
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON Pretrial Conference held on 9/19/19 (jaa, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT DEFT, JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL APPROVAL OF THE MUTUALLY-EXECUTED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT IS GRANTED. THE CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AGEEED TO AND COUNTERSIGNED BY THE PARTIES IS APPROVED BY THIS HONORABLE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/6/19.9/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Approval of Mutually-Executed Confidentiality Agreement filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement)(BOHLANDER, NATHAN)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 1/8/2020 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(kp, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PARAGRAPHS 10 THROUGH 17, INCLUSIVE, OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, INITIALLY FILED IN THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS ON JULY 18, 2019, IS HEREBY STRICKEN AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 8/20/19. 8/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (BOHLANDER, NATHAN)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERS THAT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES TO APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.16(A) IN ROOM 3809 AT 10:00 A.M. ON SEPTEMBER 19, 2019 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 8/16/19. 8/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint together with to Plaintiff's Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint)(BAXTER, PATRICIA)
August 7, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION.(dmc, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION from PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 190702161. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE201716)(dmc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANCHEZ v. JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTAGRACIA SANCHEZ
Represented By: JARED SCOTT ZAFRAN
Represented By: STEPHEN J. DEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Represented By: NATHAN R. BOHLANDER
Represented By: PATRICIA BAXTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?