KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC. et al v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES et al
Plaintiff: BELLCO DRUG CO., FWK HOLDINGS, LLC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., DAKOTA DRUG INC., J M SMITH CORPORATION, H.D. SMITH, LLC., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C, MCKESSON CORPORATION, THE NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., VALUE DRUG COMPANY, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC. and KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO, U.S. INC, ABBOTT LABORATORIES, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., ABBVIE INC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC., BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC. and ACTAVIS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03565
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 61 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC..(SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 30 DAYS OF THE COURT RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/27/2019.9/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. re #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) [NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION] (SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL)
September 27, 2019 Filing 57 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC..(SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR PLFFS TO FILE OPPOSITIONS TO DEFTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1404(a) SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 10/21/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/26/19. 9/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 56 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Teva Ltd. with Certificate of Service by ACTAVIS HOLDCO, U.S. INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(LAMAINA, KIMBERLY)
September 26, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by KIMBERLY A. LAMAINA on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO, U.S. INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(LAMAINA, KIMBERLY)
September 26, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL)
September 26, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(URBAN, NICHOLAS)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF HEIDI K. HUBBARD, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/25/19.9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 9/26/19) (kw, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF KYLE W. MACH, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/25/19.9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 9/26/19) (kw, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF BENJAMIN M. GREENBLUM, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/25/19.9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 9/26/19) (kw, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF CONSTANCE T. FORKNER, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/25/19.9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 9/26/19) (kw, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF SAMUEL BRYANT DAVIDOFF, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/25/19.9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 9/26/19) (kw, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JUSTIN PAUL RAPHAEL, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/25/19.9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES.(kw, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF ROHIT K. SINGLA, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/25/19.9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES.(kw, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 45 Joinder re #31 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia filed by PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(HAGERTY, BRIAN) Modified on 9/26/2019 (tjd ).
September 25, 2019 Filing 44 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC..(HAGERTY, BRIAN)
September 25, 2019 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Endo International plc with Certificate of Service by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..(HAGERTY, BRIAN)
September 25, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Samuel Bryant Davidoff ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13820335.) filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(HAGERTY, BRIAN) Modified on 9/26/2019 (tjd).
September 25, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Heidi Hubbard ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13820308.) filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC. Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(HAGERTY, BRIAN) Modified on 9/26/2019 (tjd).
September 25, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Constance Forkner ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13820250.) filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC. Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(HAGERTY, BRIAN) Modified on 9/26/2019 (tjd).
September 25, 2019 Filing 39 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin Greenblum ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13819996.) filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC. Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(HAGERTY, BRIAN) Modified on 9/26/2019 (tjd).
September 24, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Rohit K. Singla ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13818836.) filed by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC..CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(PIKE, JENNIFER)
September 24, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Justin Paul Raphael ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13818827.) filed by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC..Certificate of Service.(PIKE, JENNIFER)
September 24, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Kyle W. Mach ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13818808.) filed by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC..CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(PIKE, JENNIFER)
September 24, 2019 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Allergan plc with Certificate of Service by ACTAVIS, INC..(LAMAINA, KIMBERLY)
September 24, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by KIMBERLY A. LAMAINA on behalf of ACTAVIS, INC. with Certificate of Service(LAMAINA, KIMBERLY)
September 24, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER PIKE on behalf of ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. with Certificate of Service(PIKE, JENNIFER)
September 24, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. YI on behalf of ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. with Certificate of Service(YI, JOHN)
September 23, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia filed by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC..Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Appendix A, #4 Appendix B, #5 Declaration of Linda Rosol, #6 Declaration of Rohit K.Singla, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20)(SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL)
September 9, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.. PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (URBAN, NICHOLAS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (URBAN, NICHOLAS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.. PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC. waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (URBAN, NICHOLAS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.. BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (URBAN, NICHOLAS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.. ACTAVIS HOLDCO, U.S. INC waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (URBAN, NICHOLAS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.. ABBOTT LABORATORIES waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; ABBVIE INC. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (URBAN, NICHOLAS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Christopher Stewart re: served Summons and Complaint upon Actavis, Inc. by Hand Delivered on 8/22/2019 (URBAN, NICHOLAS)
September 5, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by ELLEN T. NOTEWARE on behalf of KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC. with Certificate of Service(NOTEWARE, ELLEN)
September 5, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS URBAN on behalf of KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC. with Certificate of Service(URBAN, NICHOLAS)
September 4, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated 8/27/19 (Document #'s 19, 20 & 21) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Actavis Holdco, U.S. Inc. for the following reason: Return to Sender. Not Deliverable As Addressed. Unable to Forward. (kw, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JOHN P. BJORK, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/27/19. 8/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF DAVID P. GERMAINE, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/27/19. 8/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JOSEPH M. VANEK, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/27/19. 8/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of JOHN P. BJORK by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13757916.). (SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of DAVID P. GERMAINE by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13757873.). (SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of JOSEPH M. VANEK by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13757802.). (SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by VALUE DRUG COMPANY, AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BELLCO DRUG CO., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG INC., FWK HOLDINGS, LLC., H.D. SMITH, LLC., J M SMITH CORPORATION, KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C, THE NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY. (jwl, )
August 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO, U.S. INC, ACTAVIS, INC., BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC., PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC.. Ten Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/8/19 (jwl, ) Modified on 8/8/2019 (jwl, ).
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AmerisourceBergen Corp. and H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC. with Certificate of Service by H.D. SMITH, LLC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by VALUE DRUG COMPANY.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Dakco Distributors, Inc. with Certificate of Service by DAKOTA DRUG INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including J M Smith Corp. with Certificate of Service by BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by J M SMITH CORPORATION.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MCKESSON CORPORATION.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARDINAL HEALTH, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AmerisourceBergen Corp. and Liberty Acquisition Corp. with Certificate of Service by BELLCO DRUG CO..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AmerisourceBergen Services Corp. and AmerisourceBergen Corporation with Certificate of Service by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Lyndale Enterprises, Inc. with Certificate of Service by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13718363.), filed by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(SORENSEN, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC. et al v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELLCO DRUG CO.
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FWK HOLDINGS, LLC.
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: JOHN PAUL BJORK
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VANEK
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: DAVID P. GERMAINE
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP.
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAKOTA DRUG INC.
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J M SMITH CORPORATION
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.D. SMITH, LLC.
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALUE DRUG COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.
Represented By: DAVID F. SORENSEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS URBAN
Represented By: ELLEN T. NOTEWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO, U.S. INC
Represented By: KIMBERLY A. LAMAINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Represented By: JUSTIN P. RAPHAEL
Represented By: ROHIT K SINGLA
Represented By: JENNIFER PIKE
Represented By: JOHN S. YI
Represented By: KYLE W. MACH
Represented By: PAUL H. SAINT-ANTOINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: KIMBERLY A. LAMAINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC.
Represented By: JUSTIN P. RAPHAEL
Represented By: ROHIT K SINGLA
Represented By: JENNIFER PIKE
Represented By: JOHN S. YI
Represented By: KYLE W. MACH
Represented By: PAUL H. SAINT-ANTOINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBVIE INC.
Represented By: JUSTIN P. RAPHAEL
Represented By: ROHIT K SINGLA
Represented By: JENNIFER PIKE
Represented By: JOHN S. YI
Represented By: KYLE W. MACH
Represented By: PAUL H. SAINT-ANTOINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC.
Represented By: JUSTIN P. RAPHAEL
Represented By: ROHIT K SINGLA
Represented By: JENNIFER PIKE
Represented By: JOHN S. YI
Represented By: KYLE W. MACH
Represented By: PAUL H. SAINT-ANTOINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: JUSTIN P. RAPHAEL
Represented By: ROHIT K SINGLA
Represented By: JENNIFER PIKE
Represented By: JOHN S. YI
Represented By: KYLE W. MACH
Represented By: PAUL H. SAINT-ANTOINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: CONSTANCE T. FORKNER
Represented By: BRIAN HAGERTY
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. GREENBLUM
Represented By: HEIDI K. HUBBARD
Represented By: SAMUEL BRYANT DAVIDOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: CONSTANCE T. FORKNER
Represented By: BRIAN HAGERTY
Represented By: BENJAMIN M. GREENBLUM
Represented By: SAMUEL BRYANT DAVIDOFF
Represented By: HEIDI K. HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS, INC.
Represented By: KIMBERLY A. LAMAINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?