PANZER v. VERDE ENERGY USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SCOTT PANZER
Defendant: VERDE ENERGY USA, INC. and OASIS POWER, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv03598
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME (DOC. NO. #13 ) IS DISMISSED AS UNNECESSARY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/3/2019.10/3/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PENDING A DECISION ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY filed by OASIS POWER, LLC, VERDE ENERGY USA, INC..Certificate of Service.(CHURCH, EZRA)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by OASIS POWER, LLC, VERDE ENERGY USA, INC..Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Elo Nnabuife, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Victor Lyons)(CHURCH, EZRA)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF D. GREG BLANKINSHIP, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #9 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/30/2019.9/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CHANTAL KHALIL, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #8 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/30/2019.9/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of D. Greg Blankinship filed by SCOTT PANZER..(SHAH, JAMES)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Chantal Khalil filed by SCOTT PANZER..(SHAH, JAMES)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 10/15/2019, AT 8:30 AM, IN ROOM 9614, BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/13/2019. 9/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 10/1/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/13/2019. 9/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MATTHEW D. SCHULTZ, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #2 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/23/2019.8/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF WILLIAM F. CASH III, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #3 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/23/2019.8/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of William F. Cash, III ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13750421.) filed by SCOTT PANZER..(SHAH, JAMES)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D. Schultz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13750350.) filed by SCOTT PANZER..(SHAH, JAMES)
August 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SCOTT PANZER. (ahf)
August 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to OASIS POWER, LLC, VERDE ENERGY USA, INC.. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/12/2019 (ahf)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OASIS POWER, LLC, VERDE ENERGY USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13722473.), filed by SCOTT PANZER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(SHAH, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PANZER v. VERDE ENERGY USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERDE ENERGY USA, INC.
Represented By: EZRA DODD CHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OASIS POWER, LLC
Represented By: EZRA DODD CHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT PANZER
Represented By: JAMES C. SHAH
Represented By: CHANTAL KHALIL
Represented By: D. GREG BLANKINSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?