ASSOCIATED GENERAL CONTRACTORS OF AMERICA v. ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS EASTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHAPTER, INC.
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED GENERAL CONTRACTORS OF AMERICA
Defendant: ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS EASTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHAPTER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03637
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F KELLY
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY Telephone Conference held on 9/25/19 (jl, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 3/31/20. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 4/30/20; ETC... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 9/25/19. 9/25/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 PRETRIAL PHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 9/25/2019 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY.(mr, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS EASTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHAPTER, INC..(SHANNON, DAVID)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS EASTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHAPTER, INC. HAS UNTIL 9/20/19 TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 9/6/19. 9/6/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS EASTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHAPTER, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SHANNON, DAVID)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHAEL S. CULVER, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #4 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 8/22/2019.8/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND TO MICHAEL CULVER WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ADAM D. MANDELL, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #3 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 8/22/2019.8/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND TO ADAM MANDELL WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Culver ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13750414.) filed by ASSOCIATED GENERAL CONTRACTORS OF AMERICA.Memorandum, Affidavit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(BATEMAN, JOHN)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Adam D. Mandell ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13750165.) filed by ASSOCIATED GENERAL CONTRACTORS OF AMERICA.Memorandum, Affidavit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(BATEMAN, JOHN)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (jwl, )
August 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS EASTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHAPTER, INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/13/19 (jwl, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS EASTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHAPTER, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 201954.), filed by ASSOCIATED GENERAL CONTRACTORS OF AMERICA.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASSOCIATED GENERAL CONTRACTORS OF AMERICA v. ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS EASTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHAPTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED GENERAL CONTRACTORS OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOHN J. BATEMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL S. CULVER
Represented By: ADAM D. MANDELL
Represented By: SCOTT J. MAJOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS EASTERN PENNSYLVANIA CHAPTER, INC.
Represented By: DAVID J. SHANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?