COPES v. SMITH et al
Petitioner: LEONARD COPES
Respondent: BARRY SMITH, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA and THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY
Case Number: 2:2019cv03647
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Referring Judge: THOMAS J RUETER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIPT OF STATE COURT RECORD ON 10/7/19 BY THE CHAMBERS OF THE HONORABE, THOMAS J. RUETER, UNITED STATESS MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (jpd, )
October 3, 2019 State Court Record received on 10/3/19 and forwarded to chambers.(jpd)
August 26, 2019 COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER AND CERTIFIED MAIL WITH COPY OF ORDER, PETITION AND DOCKET TO DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA, ATTORNEY GENERALS OF PHILADELPHIA AND HARRISBURG AND FAXED TO THE CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA AND E-MAILED TO PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY.(jpd,)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE A SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWER TO THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH v. COPES, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA, CP-51-CR-10727-2010 WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. PRISONER STATE RECORD DUE BY 9/25/2019. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 8/26/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER AND CERTIFIED MAIL WITH COPY OF ORDER, PETITION AND DOCKET TO DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA, ATTORNEY GENERALS OF PHILADELPHIA AND HARRISBURG AND FAXED TO THE CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA AND E-MAILED TO PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY.(jpd, )
August 22, 2019 COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER AND E-MAILED WITH COPY OF PETITION, ORDER AND DOCKET TO THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA.(jpd, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED AS MOOT BECAUSAE HE PAID THE FILING FEE. THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE THOMAS J. RUETER, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/22/19. 8/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER AND E-MAILED WITH COPY OF PETITION, ORDER AND DOCKET TO THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA.(jpd, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 202080.), filed by LEONARD COPES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, ) Modified on 8/13/2019 (nd, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by LEONARD COPES..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COPES v. SMITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BARRY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEONARD COPES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?