MARTIN v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Plaintiff: JAREED MARTIN
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Case Number: 2:2019cv03649
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY Pretrial Conference held on 9/24/2019. (sg, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER that ALL DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/24/2020; PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REPORTS DUE ON 12/27/2019; DEFENDANT'S EXPERT REPORTS DUE 1/10/2020; DEPOSITIONS OF EXPERTS MUST BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 1/24/2020 AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 2/7/2020.... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/24/2019. 9/24/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (mo, ). Modified on 9/27/2019 (mo, ). ** CLERICAL ERROR ON DISPOSITIVE MOTION S/B 2/7/2020 NOT 10/7/2020 **
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure by JAREED MARTIN.(FALCONE, CRAIG)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Discovery Plan by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE.(GOLDIS, ALLISON)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by EILEEN MARGARET BRADLEY on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE with Certificate of Service(BRADLEY, EILEEN)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/24/2019 AT 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.9/3/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE.(GOLDIS, ALLISON)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs by JAREED MARTIN (FALCONE, CRAIG) Modified on 8/14/2019 (lisad, ).
August 13, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY for LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE. with Certificate of Service by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE.(jwl, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 190700092. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202030)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTIN v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAREED MARTIN
Represented By: CRAIG A. FALCONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Represented By: ALLISON I. BRESSLER GOLDIS
Represented By: EILEEN MARGARET BRADLEY
Represented By: ALLISON BRESSLER GOLDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?