SAPP v. SAUL
Plaintiff: DEREK CHRISTOPHER SAPP
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv03652
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Social Security Administrative Record . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Court transcript index 09.27.2019, #2 Appendix Documents related to administrative process including transcript of oral hearing, if applicable, 09.16.2016, #3 Appendix Payment documents and decisions 09.16.2016, #4 Appendix Jurisdictional documents and notices 09.16.2016, #5 Appendix Non disability related development 09.16.2016, #6 Appendix Disability related development 09.16.2016, #7 Appendix Medical Records 09.16.2016, #8 Appendix Documents related to adminitrative process including transcript of oral hearing, if applicable, 09.27.2019, #9 Appendix Payment documents and decisions 09.27.2019, #10 Appendix Jurisdictional documents and notices, Part 1 09.27.2019, #11 Appendix Jurisdictional documents and notices, Part 2 09.27.2019, #12 Appendix Non disability related development 09.27.2019, #13 Appendix Disability related development 09.27.2019, #14 Appendix Medical Records, Part 1 09.27.2019, #15 Appendix Part 2 - 09.27.2019, #16 Appendix Part 3 - 09.27.2019, #17 Appendix Part 4 - 09.27.2019, #18 Appendix Part 5 - 09.27.2019)(LYNCH, ANDREW)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas D. Sutton re: served Summons upon ATTY GEN & COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY by Certified Mail (va, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Social Security Magistrate Consent by DEREK CHRISTOPHER SAPP.. (SUTTON, THOMAS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 consent form)(fdc, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Procedural Order 8/13/19 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (fdc, )
August 13, 2019 Three (3) Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded To: Thomas Sutton, U.S. Attorney's Office on 8/13/19. (fdc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202070.), filed by DEREK CHRISTOPHER SAPP.(fdc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAPP v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Represented By: ANDREW C. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK CHRISTOPHER SAPP
Represented By: THOMAS D. SUTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?