STYER v. TRATTORIA SAN DOMENICO, INC. et al
Plaintiff: POLLY STYER
Defendant: ALESSANDRO FERANTE, GIUSEPPE MUSSO, ALEX FERANTE and TRATTORIA SAN DOMENICO, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03653
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG TO HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/02/2019. 10/02/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by YINAN MA on behalf of POLLY STYER (MA, YINAN)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA W. CLARK on behalf of POLLY STYER (CLARK, JULIA)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by POLLY STYER. ALESSANDRO FERANTE waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; GIUSEPPE MUSSO waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; TRATTORIA SAN DOMENICO, INC. waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (KARPF, ARI)
August 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by POLLY STYER. (jwl, )
August 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to ALESSANDRO FERANTE, GIUSEPPE MUSSO, TRATTORIA SAN DOMENICO, INC.. Three Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/14/19 (jwl, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALESSANDRO FERANTE, GIUSEPPE MUSSO, TRATTORIA SAN DOMENICO, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13731252.), filed by POLLY STYER.(KARPF, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STYER v. TRATTORIA SAN DOMENICO, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALESSANDRO FERANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIUSEPPE MUSSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX FERANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRATTORIA SAN DOMENICO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POLLY STYER
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Represented By: YINAN MA
Represented By: JULIA W. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?