CIRIGHT ONE, LLC v. OU et al
Plaintiff: CIRIGHT ONE, LLC
Defendant: GEORGE OU and LILLIBETH OU
Nominal Defendant: BINJI FINTECH, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03720
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 11/4/2019 AT 3:00 PM, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL TO CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7780, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THE OCTOBER 7, 2019 HEARING IS CANCELLED.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/02/2019. 10/02/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Telephone Conference held on 10/1/19 (fdc, )
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' 9/17/19 UNOPPOSED LETTER REQUEST #10 FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS ARE DUE ON OR BEFORE 10/15/19. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/17/19. 9/17/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by BINJI FINTECH, INC., GEORGE OU, LILLIBETH OU re #1 Complaint Letter to the Honorable Juan R. Sanchez from John G. Harris, Esquire dated September 17, 2019 (HARRIS, JOHN)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/1/19 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ.SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/12/19. 9/12/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Telephone Conference held on 9/10/19 (fdc, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of Appearance of John G. Harris, Esquire of Berger Harris LLP on behalf of defendants George and Lillibeth Ou and Binji Fintec, Inc. filed by BINJI FINTECH, INC., GEORGE OU, LILLIBETH OU.Certificate of Service.(HARRIS, JOHN) Modified on 9/10/2019 (lvj, ).
September 4, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/10/2019 11:00 AM BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. (fdc, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FRCP 65 IS RESCHEDULED TO 10/7/19 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 14B BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/4/19. 9/4/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE EMERGENCY HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #2 IS RESCHEDULED TO 9/5/19 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 14B BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/22/19. 8/22/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING TO AUGUST 22, 2019 AT 3:30 P.M. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/20/2019. 8/20/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(stwe, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SCHEDULING EMERGENCY HEARING FOR 8/20/2019 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ IN COURTROOM 14B. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF ITS COMPLAINT, MOTION AND THIS ORDER ON DEFENDANTS PRIOR TO HEARING. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/19/2019. 8/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(stwe, )
August 19, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CIRIGHT ONE, LLC. (ahf)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY CIRIGHT ONE, LLC. AFFIDAVIT.(ahf)
August 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to BINJI FINTECH, INC., GEORGE OU, LILLIBETH OU. 3 Given To: Counsel on 8/19/2019. (ahf)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BINJI FINTECH, INC., GEORGE OU, LILLIBETH OU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202289.), filed by CIRIGHT ONE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CIRIGHT ONE, LLC v. OU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE OU
Represented By: JOHN G. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LILLIBETH OU
Represented By: JOHN G. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIRIGHT ONE, LLC
Represented By: PAUL BUCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: BINJI FINTECH, INC.
Represented By: JOHN G. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?