JACQUALINE N. et al v. THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: CARLOS D., EMPIRICAL PEDIATRIC THERAPY, INC., AMY MCGINNIS BEHAVIORAL CONSULTING, INC., MELISSA H., BRIDGET M., EVELISSE D., ANTHONY L., STEPHEN O., MARK S., JACQUALINE N., CYNDI S., MICHAEL H. and CHENA S.
Defendant: KIM HARRIS, THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA and DOES 1-9
Case Number: 2:2019cv03748
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by HANNAH GIRER-ROSENKRANTZ on behalf of THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GIRER-ROSENKRANTZ, HANNAH)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 2 WAIVERS OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARK S., EVELISSE D., MELISSA H., JACQUALINE N., AMY MCGINNIS BEHAVIORAL CONSULTING, INC., CARLOS D., MICHAEL H., BRIDGET M., EMPIRICAL PEDIATRIC THERAPY, INC., STEPHEN O., CHENA S., CYNDI S., ANTHONY L.. KIM HARRIS waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (amas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 for Entry of Appearance of Christine M. Gordon for by ANTHONY L., CARLOS D., CHENA S., EVELISSE D., JACQUALINE N., MELISSA H., MICHAEL H.. (GORDON, CHRISTINE)
August 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AMY MCGINNIS BEHAVIORAL CONSULTING, INC., ANTHONY L., BRIDGET M., CARLOS D., CHENA S., CYNDI S., EMPIRICAL PEDIATRIC THERAPY, INC., EVELISSE D., JACQUALINE N., MARK S., MELISSA H., MICHAEL H., STEPHEN O.. (ahf)
August 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to DOES 1-9, KIM HARRIS, THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/21/2019 (ahf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-9, KIM HARRIS, THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202394.), filed by MARK S., EVELISSE D., MELISSA H., JACQUALINE N., AMY MCGINNIS BEHAVIORAL CONSULTING, INC., CARLOS D., MICHAEL H., BRIDGET M., EMPIRICAL PEDIATRIC THERAPY, INC., STEPHEN O., CHENA S., CYNDI S., ANTHONY L.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACQUALINE N. et al v. THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS D.
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: CHRISTINE M. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPIRICAL PEDIATRIC THERAPY, INC.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. STANCZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY MCGINNIS BEHAVIORAL CONSULTING, INC.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. STANCZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA H.
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: CHRISTINE M. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIDGET M.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. STANCZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELISSE D.
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: CHRISTINE M. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY L.
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: CHRISTINE M. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN O.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. STANCZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK S.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. STANCZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUALINE N.
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: CHRISTINE M. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNDI S.
Represented By: FREDERICK M. STANCZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL H.
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: CHRISTINE M. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHENA S.
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: CHRISTINE M. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: HANNAH GIRER-ROSENKRANTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?