WHITE v. BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: VARKENO DELORENZO WHITE
Defendant: BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03750
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND (DOCUMENT #15 ) WILL BE HELD AT THE 11/26/2019 RULE 16 CONFERENCE.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/17/2019. 10/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SIMMONS, WILLIAM)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED TO 11/26/19 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/9/19. 10/10/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (nd, )
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHAD J. KALDOR, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/30/19. 9/30/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by VARKENO DELORENZO WHITE.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DRAKE, E.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chad J. Kaldor by BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC., Statement, Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID) (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(fdc)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/1/19 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 14B BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/17/19. 9/17/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Vertical Screen with Certificate of Service by BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC..(SIMMONS, WILLIAM)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC..(SIMMONS, WILLIAM)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ROD M. FLIEGEL, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/11/19.9/11/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ROD M. FLIEGEL, ESQ. FILED BY BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILING FEE PAID) (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(fdc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rod M. Fliegel by BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC... (Attachments: #1 Sponsor Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SIMMONS, WILLIAM)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JOHN G. ALBANESE, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/29/19. 8/29/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF E. MICHELLE DRAKE, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/29/19. 8/29/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S CONSENT #2 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC. IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 9/11/19 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/29/19.8/29/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John G. Albanese by VARKENO DELORENZO WHITE. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13764011.). (Attachments: #1 Sponsor Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CARSON, SHANON)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of E. Michelle Drake by VARKENO DELORENZO WHITE. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13764005.). (Attachments: #1 Sponsor Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CARSON, SHANON)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff Complaint (Consent) filed by BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SIMMONS, WILLIAM)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC. from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 19005063. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202392) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VARKENO DELORENZO WHITE
Represented By: SHANON J. CARSON
Represented By: E. MICHELLE DRAKE
Represented By: JOHN G. ALBANESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUSINESS INFORMATION GROUP, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. SIMMONS
Represented By: CHAD J. KALDOR
Represented By: ROD M. FLIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?