TATE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: MONNAE ANGELIQUE TATE
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv03751
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT ATTORNEY THOMAS D. SUTTON IS APPOINTED TO REPRESENT PLAINTIFF MONNAE A. TATE IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 9/20/19. 9/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS D. SUTTON on behalf of MONNAE ANGELIQUE TATE (SUTTON, THOMAS)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THE CASE ON THE EXTRANET FOR SELECTION BY A PANEL ATTORNEY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 8/26/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE TATE.(rf, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/19/18.8/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO TATE. (rf, )
August 23, 2019 3 Original Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 2 Summons forwarded to the US Marshal and 1 Summons to US Attorney on 8/23/19. (rf, )
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FRCP 4(I) AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 8/21/19. 8/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(rf, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (dmc, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Magistrate Consent by MONNAE ANGELIQUE TATE. (dmc, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by MONNAE ANGELIQUE TATE..(dmc, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by MONNAE ANGELIQUE TATE.(No Envelope Provided)(dmc, ) Modified on 8/22/2019 (md).
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MONNAE ANGELIQUE TATE..(dmc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TATE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONNAE ANGELIQUE TATE
Represented By: THOMAS D. SUTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?