JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. SUTTON et al
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Defendant: SANDRA L. HUTT, AARON SUTTON, JR. and 4101 NEW ADDITION, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03756
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE: A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/13/2020 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3-C(mbh, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 10/17/19 before Judge Kenney. (mbh, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: THAT 1. THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RUETER FOR THE SCHEDULING OF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONTACT JUDGE RUETER'S CHAMBERS BEFORE THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY, JANUARY 11, 2020. 2. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY JANUARY 11, 2020. 3. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 14, 2020. RESPONSE(S) TO ANY SUCH MOTION SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED WITHIN TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS AFTER SERVICE OF THE MOTION. 4. ALL TRIAL EXHIBITS SHALL BE MARKED AND EXCHANGED ON OR BEFORE APRIL 13, 2020. 5. MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE DUE BY APRIL 13, 2020. THE RESPONSES TO ANY MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED WITHIN SEVEN (7) DAYS AFTER SERVICE OF THE MOTION. 6. ALL PARTIES ARE TO PREPARE AND FILE WITH THE CLERK OF COURT THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA, INCLUDING PROPOSED POINTS FOR CHARGE, AND PROPOSED VERDICT SLIP IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER AND LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16.1(c) ON OR BEFORE APRIL 13, 2020. 7. A DATE CERTAIN NON-JURY TRIAL WILL COMMENCE ON THURSDAY, APRIL 23, 2020 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 6A. ON THE MORNING OF TRIAL, COUNSEL ARE TO SUPPLY THE COURT WITH A JOINT EXHIBIT BINDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/17/2019. 10/17/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sme, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Case Management Plan by all Parties by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. SANDRA L. HUTT waiver sent on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. AARON SUTTON, JR waiver sent on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. 4101 NEW ADDITION, INC. waiver sent on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (ECF NO. 10) IS GRANTED. ALL PARTIES' COUNSEL ARE PERMITTED TO ATTEND THE ON THE RECORD RULE 16 CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 17, 2010 AT 10:00 A.M. BY TELEPHONE. MR. LONSTEIN SHALL INITIATE THE CALL TO JUDGE KENNEY'S CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7540, WITH ALL COUNSEL PRESENT ON THE CALL, NO LATER THAN 9:55 A.M. THE CALL WILL THEN BE TRANSFERRED TO THE COURTROOM AT THE APPROPRIATE TIME. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/26/2019. 9/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sme, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at the 10/17/19 Initial Pretrial Conference filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC..Motion to Allow Counsel to Appear Telephonically at the 10/17/19 Initial Pretrial Conference. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: THAT AN ON THE RECORD INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, OCTOBER 17, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 6A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/25/2019. 9/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AARON SUTTON, JR.(MCCREESH, JOHN)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 4101 NEW ADDITION, INC., SANDRA L. HUTT.(MCCREESH, JOHN)
September 23, 2019 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by 4101 NEW ADDITION, INC.. (SEE PAPER #6 FOR ATTACHMENT).(fb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by 4101 NEW ADDITION, INC. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (MCCREESH, JOHN)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. MCCREESH, IV on behalf of AARON SUTTON, JR (MCCREESH, JOHN)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. MCCREESH, IV on behalf of 4101 NEW ADDITION, INC., SANDRA L. HUTT (MCCREESH, JOHN)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (ahf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC..(ahf)
August 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to 4101 NEW ADDITION, INC., SANDRA L. HUTT, AARON SUTTON, JR. 3 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/21/2019 (ahf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 4101 NEW ADDITION, INC., SANDRA L. HUTT, AARON SUTTON, JR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202407.), filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. SUTTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA L. HUTT
Represented By: JOHN J. MCCREESH, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON SUTTON, JR.
Represented By: JOHN J. MCCREESH, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4101 NEW ADDITION, INC.
Represented By: JOHN J. MCCREESH, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Represented By: WAYNE D. LONSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?