SUKWANPUTRA et al v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: ELYANA SUKWANPUTRA and FNU YULIUS
Defendant: DAVID NEAL, SIMONA FLORES, KEVIN MCALEENAN, WILLIAM BARR, JOSHUA REID and MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Case Number: 2:2019cv03965
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/4/19.10/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Vountarily per FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by ELYANA SUKWANPUTRA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BIA Order Granting Stay of Removal)(ISBELL, ALEX)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Audio File 9/18/19 3:45pm, held on 9/18/19, before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON (jwl, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry, re: Hearing for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON in Courtroom 3A on 9/18/19. Status update within 30 days. Taken under advisement. Court Reporter: ESR. (kw, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT PLFFS ARE GIVEN LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED AND/OR SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT WITHIN 14 DAYS, OR TO FILE A SEPARATE COMPLAINT IN THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PA, SEEKING HABEAS RELIEF, AS SOON AS PRACTICABLE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/19/19. 9/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/19/19. 9/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLFFS' COUNSEL SHALL FILE AN UPDATE OF THE CLIENTS' STATUS WITHIN 30 DAYS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/18/19. 9/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum re #7 Plaintiff's Brief and Statement of Issues in Support of Request for Review of Motion for TRO, Preliminary Injunction, or Stay of Removal filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, SIMONA FLORES, KEVIN MCALEENAN, DAVID NEAL, JOSHUA REID. (DEBRUICKER, LAUREN)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Brief in Response to the Court's Order September 5, 2019 Concerning Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ELYANA SUKWANPUTRA and FNU YULIUS. Certificate of Service.(ISBELL, ALEX) Modified on 9/16/2019 (tjd).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLFFS SHALL FORTHWITH SERVE THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THIS DISTRICT WITH A COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, THE ABOVE CITED MOTION, & ALL FUTURE PAPERS IN THIS CASE, ETC. PENDING ORAL ARGUMENT BEFORE THIS COURT, IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFTS SHALL GIVE AT LEAST 10 DAYS' WRITTEN NOTICE TO THE COURT, PLFFS, & THEIR COUNSEL BEFORE INSTITUTING ANY REMOVAL OF PLFFS FROM THE UNTIED STATES, ETC. THE COURT WILL HAVE ARGUMENT ON THIS ISSUE ON 9/18/2019 AT 3:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 3A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/5/19. 9/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER on behalf of MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, SIMONA FLORES, KEVIN MCALEENAN, DAVID NEAL, JOSHUA REID with Certificate of Service(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney, Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kw, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Stay Removal filed by ELYANA SUKWANPUTRA. Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ISBELL, ALEX) Modified on 9/3/2019 (tjd).
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ELYANA SUKWANPUTRA, FNU YULIUS.(jaa, )
August 30, 2019 8 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, SIMONA FLORES, KEVIN MCALEENAN, DAVID NEAL, JOSHUA REID, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 7 COUNSEL AND 1 AUSA on 8/30/19 (jaa, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, SIMONA FLORES, KEVIN MCALEENAN, DAVID NEAL, JOSHUA REID ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE202850.) filed by FNU YULIUS, ELYANA SUKWANPUTRA.(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUKWANPUTRA et al v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMONA FLORES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELYANA SUKWANPUTRA
Represented By: ALEX GREGORY ISBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FNU YULIUS
Represented By: ALEX GREGORY ISBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?