WIBOWO v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: TRI KOENCORO WIBOWO and JOHAN H. GUNAWAN
Defendant: DAVID NEAL, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, SIMONA FLORES, JOSHUA REID and KEVIN MCALEENAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv03966
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL IS GRANTED. THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE UNDER FRCP 41(a)(1). THE CLERKOF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/8/19. 10/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw Voluntarily per FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by TRI KOENCORO WIBOWO.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BIA Decision Granting Stay)(ISBELL, ALEX)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JUDITH A. AMOROSA on behalf of MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, SIMONA FLORES, KEVIN MCALEENAN, DAVID NEAL, JOSHUA REID with Certificate of Service(AMOROSA, JUDITH)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (mbh, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTAINING ORDER IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO MOVE FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AFTER CONFIRMING SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT AND SUBSEQUENT MOTIONS AND WHEN PREPARED TO PROMPTLY MOVE TOWARDS A HEARING AND RESOLUTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/4/19.9/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Certificate of Service, re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order /Stay of Removal filed by TRI KOENCORO WIBOWO.(ISBELL, ALEX) Modified on 9/3/2019 (fb).
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order /Stay of Removal filed by TRI KOENCORO WIBOWO.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(ISBELL, ALEX)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, filed by PLFF TRI KOENCORO WIBOWO.(kw, )
August 30, 2019 (8) Summons Issued as to MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, SIMONA FLORES, KEVIN MCALEENAN, DAVID NEAL, JOSHUA REID, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded To: counsel on 9/3/19. (kw, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, SIMONA FLORES, KEVIN MCALEENAN, DAVID NEAL, JOSHUA REID, Certficate of Service. ( Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE202851.), filed by TRI KOENCORO WIBOWO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, ) Modified on 9/3/2019 (kw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WIBOWO v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRI KOENCORO WIBOWO
Represented By: ALEX GREGORY ISBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHAN H. GUNAWAN
Represented By: ALEX GREGORY ISBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID NEAL
Represented By: JUDITH A. AMOROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: JUDITH A. AMOROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: JUDITH A. AMOROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMONA FLORES
Represented By: JUDITH A. AMOROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA REID
Represented By: JUDITH A. AMOROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Represented By: JUDITH A. AMOROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?