Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Chemical Equipment Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Defendant: CHEMICAL EQUIPMENT LABS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03999
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06484. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 29, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of Pennsylvania (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRANSFER ORDER denying #10 Motion to Dismiss; granting #10 Motion to Transfer Case. On July 31, 2019, Defendant Chemical Equipment Labs, Inc. filed a motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer. See ECF No. 10. Defendant's motion to transfer is hereby GRANTED on consent, see ECF No. 15, and the motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to renewal in the transferee court. The Clerk of Court is directed to immediately transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, to terminate ECF No. 10, and to close the case on this Court's docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/29/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively. MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Stern, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by August 21, 2019. Plaintiff will not be given any further opportunity to amend the complaint to address issues raised by the motion to dismiss. If Plaintiff does amend, by three (3) weeks after the amended complaint is filed, Defendant shall: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) file a letter on ECF stating that it relies on the previously filed motion to dismiss. If Defendant files an answer or a new motion to dismiss, the Court will deny the previously filed motion to dismiss as moot. If Defendant files a new motion to dismiss, any opposition shall be filed within two weeks of its filing, and any reply shall be filed within one week of such opposition. If no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss by August 21, 2019. Defendant's reply, if any, shall be filed by August 28, 2019. At the time any reply is filed, the moving party shall supply the Court with one, double-sided courtesy hard copy of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Finally, it is further ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for October 2, 2019 is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/1/2019) ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/21/2019., Responses due by 8/21/2019, Replies due by 8/28/2019.) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Edward R. Morgan in Support re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively. MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Chemical Equipment Labs, Inc.. (Bennett, William) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of William R. Bennett in Support re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively. MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Chemical Equipment Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, William) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively. MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Chemical Equipment Labs, Inc.. (Bennett, William) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively., MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by Chemical Equipment Labs, Inc..(Bennett, William) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chemical Equipment Labs, Inc.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/15/2019) (ne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chemical Equipment Labs, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Federici, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Evan Stern. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $188,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $189,000;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Robert Federici on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Federici, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Edward Mercante on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Mercante, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Stern, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stern, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stern, Michael) Modified on 7/12/2019 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chemical Equipment Labs, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17234906)Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 CLL Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 Cargo Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 Award, #4 Exhibit 4 March 22, 2019 Denial, #5 Exhibit 5 April 17, 2019 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 April 23, 2019 Denial)(Stern, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Chemical Equipment Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEMICAL EQUIPMENT LABS, INC.
Represented By: William Robert Bennett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael Evan Stern
Represented By: James Edward Mercante
Represented By: Joseph Robert Federici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?