STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. VALKYRIE CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Defendant: VALKYRIE CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04044
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of extension to file Answer by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)*FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 9/27/2019 (lisad, ).
September 19, 2019 One (1) Summons Issued as to FREDERICK JAMES. Forwarded To: Daniel J. De Luca on 9/19/19. (fdc)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FREDERICK JAMES, filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.(fdc)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT PLFF SHALL FILE & SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 9/20/2019, AN AMENDED COMPLAINT SETTING FORTH THE IDENTITY AND CITIZENSHIP OF THE MEMBERS OF DEFT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/6/19. 9/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTY.(kw, )
September 3, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to VALKYRIE CONSTRUCTION, LLC. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 9/5/19 (jaa, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANIES for STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO..(jaa, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VALKYRIE CONSTRUCTION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE203168.) filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. VALKYRIE CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: DANIEL J. DE LUCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALKYRIE CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?