COOPER v. SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL COOPER
Defendant: HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, BENEFITS COMMITTEE OF SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION and SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv04092
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BENEFITS COMMITTEE OF SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION. BENEFITS COMMITTEE OF SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (DOWNEY, BRIAN)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN. SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (DOWNEY, BRIAN)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. DOWNEY on behalf of BENEFITS COMMITTEE OF SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION, SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(DOWNEY, BRIAN)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. MULLEN on behalf of BENEFITS COMMITTEE OF SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION, SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN with Certificate of Service(MULLEN, KATHLEEN)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (DOWNEY, BRIAN)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. DOWNEY on behalf of HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DOWNEY, BRIAN)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. MULLEN on behalf of HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MULLEN, KATHLEEN)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/10/2019. 9/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
September 6, 2019 Three Summonses Issued as to BENEFITS COMMITTEE OF SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION, HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN. Forwarded To: JENNIFER S. NASH, ESQ. on 9/10/2019 (dmc, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BENEFITS COMMITTEE OF SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION, HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE203264.), filed by MICHAEL COOPER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(dmc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOPER v. SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENEFITS COMMITTEE OF SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT-GOBAIN CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL COOPER
Represented By: JENNIFER SUSANNE NASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?