STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Defendant: SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv04120
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/21/2019 09:00 AM IN JUDGE BARTLE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. ADDITIONAL CONFERENCE INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN.(km, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TROY, PAUL)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL C. TROY on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY with Jury Demand, Ceritificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(TROY, PAUL)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. re: Jeffrey Nugent served Summons and Complaint upon SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY by Personal Service. SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)
September 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. (ahf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANIES for STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO..(ahf)
September 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/10/2019 (ahf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 203384.), filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: DANIEL J. DE LUCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?