THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY v. PACKAGING CONSULTANTS ASSOCIATED, INC.
Plaintiff: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: PACKAGING CONSULTANTS ASSOCIATED, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04121
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER H. SWAYZE, III on behalf of PACKAGING CONSULTANTS ASSOCIATED, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(SWAYZE, WALTER)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHESTER F. DARLINGTON on behalf of PACKAGING CONSULTANTS ASSOCIATED, INC. with Certificate of Service(DARLINGTON, CHESTER)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by EDMUND P. PERRY on behalf of THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(PERRY, EDMUND)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTERS ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY. SEE FED. R. CIV. P. 42(A). ALL PLEADINGS, MOTIONS, DISCOVERY, AND OTHER MATTERS IN ALL THREE CASES SHALL BE FILED IN CIVL ACTION NO. 19-2679. ALL PAPERS FILED IN THE CONSOLIDATED ACTION SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING CAPTION: SIMON & SCHUSTER, INC. v. PACKAGING CONSULTANTS ASSOCIATED, INC., CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-2679. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE CIVIL ACTION NOS. 19-4077 AND 19-4121 IN SUSPENSE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/10/2019. 9/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
September 9, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to PACKAGING CONSULTANTS ASSOCIATED, INC.. Forwarded To: THOMAS UNDERWOOD on 9/10/19 (jl, )
September 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (jl, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY.(jl, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PACKAGING CONSULTANTS ASSOCIATED, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE203383.), filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, JURY DEMAND.(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY v. PACKAGING CONSULTANTS ASSOCIATED, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS UNDERWOOD, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACKAGING CONSULTANTS ASSOCIATED, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?