FELDMAN v. PA AUTO INSURANCE OUTLET CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: ALAN MORRIS FELDMAN
Defendant: WARREN KUKISH, ROBERT REFICE, EDWARD GERBER and PA AUTO INSURANCE OUTLET CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv04129
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing:Rule 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/10/2019 02:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER.(adr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EDWARD GERBER, WARREN KUKISH, PA AUTO INSURANCE OUTLET CORPORATION, ROBERT REFICE re #2 Notice of Appearance (SOKORAI, RICHARD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by EDWARD GERBER, WARREN KUKISH, PA AUTO INSURANCE OUTLET CORPORATION, ROBERT REFICE.(SOKORAI, RICHARD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EDWARD GERBER, WARREN KUKISH, PA AUTO INSURANCE OUTLET CORPORATION, ROBERT REFICE.(SOKORAI, RICHARD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD C. SOKORAI on behalf of EDWARD GERBER, WARREN KUKISH, PA AUTO INSURANCE OUTLET CORPORATION, ROBERT REFICE with Certificate of Service(SOKORAI, RICHARD)
September 10, 2019 4 Summons Issued as to EDWARD GERBER, WARREN KUKISH, PA AUTO INSURANCE OUTLET CORPORATION, ROBERT REFICE. Given To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL over counter on 9/10/2019. (sg, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EDWARD GERBER, WARREN KUKISH, PA AUTO INSURANCE OUTLET CORPORATION, ROBERT REFICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 203371.), filed by ALAN MORRIS FELDMAN.(sg, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2019: #1 COVER SHEETS) (sg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FELDMAN v. PA AUTO INSURANCE OUTLET CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN KUKISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT REFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD GERBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA AUTO INSURANCE OUTLET CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN MORRIS FELDMAN
Represented By: ROBERT SCANDONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?