CHAMBERS v. BOGAN et al
Petitioner: MARK CHAMBERS
Respondent: AGENT PATRICK MANGOLD, WARDEN JOHN DELANEY, P/O TIMOTHY BOGAN, D.A. LARRY KRASNER, CHIEF INSPECTOR ANTHONY BOYLE, INSPECTOR RAYMOND EVERS, P/O JEFFERY M. GALAZKA and N.F.U & PPD
Case Number: 2:2019cv04131
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR OBJECTION AND A TIMELY RESPONSE TO THE UNITED STATES RECOMMENDATION, filed by MARK CHAMBERS. EXHIBITS..(sg, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE PETTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BE SUMMARILY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND THAT NO CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY SHALL ISSUE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 10/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Civ 623) 10/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER.(jpd, )
October 11, 2019 COPY OF PETITION, ORDER, DOCKET SENT TO DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY VIA EMAIL ON 10/11/19. (rf, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE THOMAS J. RUETER FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. PURSUANT TO LRCP 72.1.IV(c) ALL ISSUES AND EVIDENCE SHALL BE PRESENTED TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND THAT NEW ISSUES AND EVIDENCE SHALL NOT BE RAISED AFTER THE FILING OF THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IF THEY COULD HAVE BEEN PRESENTED TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 10/11/19. 10/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO CHAMBERS. *COPY OF ORDER, DOCKET AND PETITION EMAILED TO THE DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY*(rf, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by MARK CHAMBERS. *ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION FOR PRISONERS TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, *ENVELOPE ATTACHED* filed by MARK CHAMBERS.(rf, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH PETITIONER WITH AN APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER PETITIONER SHALL COMPLETE AND RETURN THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR REMIT THE REQUIRED $5.00 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT. IF PETITIONER DOES NOT COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER THE CIVIL ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE TO PETITIONER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 9/16/19. 9/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO CHAMBERS. *APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS MAILED TO CHAMBERS ON 9/16/19*(rf, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (amas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus together with statement in support of request to proceed in forma pauperis, filed by MARK CHAMBERS. (NO IFP, NO FEE PAID) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAMBERS v. BOGAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AGENT PATRICK MANGOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN JOHN DELANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P/O TIMOTHY BOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D.A. LARRY KRASNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHIEF INSPECTOR ANTHONY BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: INSPECTOR RAYMOND EVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P/O JEFFERY M. GALAZKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N.F.U & PPD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARK CHAMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?