WASHINGTON v. SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY et al
Plaintiff: FREDERICK WASHINGTON
Defendant: DARYL K. JONES, MICHAEL G. BORING, JAKARITA JONES, SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, RICHARD DRAYTON, DENISE SINGLETON and MICHAEL J. GRITSKO
Case Number: 2:2019cv04213
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MICHAEL G. BORING, RICHARD DRAYTON, MICHAEL J. GRITSKO, DARYL K. JONES, JAKARITA JONES, DENISE SINGLETON, SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.(FERRER, PEDRO)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by PEDRO M. FERRER on behalf of MICHAEL G. BORING, RICHARD DRAYTON, MICHAEL J. GRITSKO, DARYL K. JONES, JAKARITA JONES, DENISE SINGLETON, SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY (FERRER, PEDRO)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FREDERICK WASHINGTON. SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FREDERICK WASHINGTON. MICHAEL G. BORING waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FREDERICK WASHINGTON. DARYL K. JONES waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FREDERICK WASHINGTON. MICHAEL J. GRITSKO waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FREDERICK WASHINGTON. RICHARD DRAYTON waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FREDERICK WASHINGTON. DENISE SINGLETON waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FREDERICK WASHINGTON. JAKARITA JONES waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
September 11, 2019 (7) Summons Issued as to MICHAEL G. BORING, RICHARD DRAYTON, MICHAEL J. GRITSKO, DARYL K. JONES, JAKARITA JONES, DENISE SINGLETON, SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. Forwarded To: counsel on 9/13/19. (kw, )
September 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PLFF FREDERICK WASHINGTON. (kw, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL G. BORING, RICHARD DRAYTON, MICHAEL J. GRITSKO, DARYL K. JONES, JAKARITA JONES, DENISE SINGLETON, SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ( Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE203570.), filed by FREDERICK WASHINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WASHINGTON v. SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARYL K. JONES
Represented By: PEDRO M. FERRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL G. BORING
Represented By: PEDRO M. FERRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAKARITA JONES
Represented By: PEDRO M. FERRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Represented By: PEDRO M. FERRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD DRAYTON
Represented By: PEDRO M. FERRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISE SINGLETON
Represented By: PEDRO M. FERRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. GRITSKO
Represented By: PEDRO M. FERRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK WASHINGTON
Represented By: CATHERINE W. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?