Miller v. Kauffman et al
Petitioner: EUGENE MILLER
Respondent: SUPERINTENDENT KEVIN KAUFFMAN and ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2019cv04278
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-01364. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting application to proceed IFP #4 and petition is deemed as timely filed; Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER case to the ED of PA. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 9/17/19. (sm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/17/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Letter re Filing Fee filed by Eugene Miller. (bg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/17/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Habeas Corpus))(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/17/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/17/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Eugene Miller.(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Kauffman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EUGENE MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUPERINTENDENT KEVIN KAUFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?