BURCH et al v. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: HOWARD BURCH and CHERYL L BURCH
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv04343
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/30/2020 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/28/19. 10/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing(kp, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUGGESTION OF RECORD TO VACATE RE: DOC.10 - NOTICE ARBITRATION HRG. by CHERYL L BURCH, HOWARD BURCH. (FULMER, JAY)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 2/13/2020 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(kp, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jaa, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(TREDWELL, SCOTT)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIM OF TWENTY (20) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THE FILING OF THIS STIPULATION IN WHICH TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-ENTITLED ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/25/19. 9/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE WITHIN PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS STRICKEN AND DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/25/19. 9/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 9/26/2019 (tjd).
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY.(SHIKUNOV, GLEN)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GLEN SHIKUNOV on behalf of GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(SHIKUNOV, GLEN)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (FULMER, JAY)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHERYL L BURCH, HOWARD BURCH. (FULMER, JAY)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY LAWRENCE FULMER on behalf of CHERYL L BURCH, HOWARD BURCH with Certificate of Service(FULMER, JAY)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number CV-2019-02429. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE203951), EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURCH et al v. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT J. TREDWELL
Represented By: GLEN SHIKUNOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD BURCH
Represented By: JAY LAWRENCE FULMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL L BURCH
Represented By: JAY LAWRENCE FULMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?