KEGLER v. ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DARRYL KEGLER
Defendant: ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC. and SYNEOS HEALTH, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04349
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Referring Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/11/2020 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/26/2020. 2/27/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON TO HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 02/25/2020. 02/25/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(nd, ) Modified on 2/25/2020 (nd, ).
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT ATTORNEY BRIAN K. NAGATANI'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 1/30/2020. 1/31/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APP MAILED.(sg, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian K. Nagatani by ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(HUMMA, TARA) FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 210466. Modified on 1/29/2020 (sg, ).
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 23, 2020 IS RESCHEDULED FOR MARCH 11, 2020 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS ROOM 3809, BEFORE HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 01/22/20. 01/22/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 Letter Request for Adjournment of Rule 16 Conference by ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC.. (HUMMA, TARA) Modified on 1/17/2020 (lisad, ).
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC..(HUMMA, TARA)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC..(HUMMA, TARA)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ARE TO APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 23, 2020 AT 2:00 PM IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 3809, BEFORE HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/30/19. 12/30/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by TARA L. HUMMA on behalf of ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC. with Certificate of Service(HUMMA, TARA)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by DENISE M. KEYSER on behalf of ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC. with Certificate of Service(KEYSER, DENISE)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mayuri Reddy re: served Complaint on Defendant Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. upon Person in Charge by Certified Mail on 12/09/2019 (DELGAIZO, CHRISTOPHER)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by SYNEOS HEALTH, INC..(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
October 28, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 10/29/2019 (sg, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC., SYNEOS HEALTH, INC., filed by DARRYL KEGLER. EXHIBITS.(sg, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. #2 ) IS STRICKEN FOR FAILURE TO INCLUDE THE ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION AS REQUIRED IN SECTION II.B.4 OF JUDGE WOLSON'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. DEFENDANT IS GRANTED LEAVE TO COMPLY WITH THIS REQUIREMENT AND RE-FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS, IF NECESSARY, WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/17/2019.10/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by HARRY MATTHEW TAYLOR on behalf of SYNEOS HEALTH, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TAYLOR, HARRY)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SYNEOS HEALTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SYNEOS HEALTH, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER) *STRICKEN PER ORDER #2 FILED 10/17/19* Modified on 10/21/2019 (lisad, ).
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC., SYNEOS HEALTH, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13811067.), filed by DARRYL WALLACE KEGLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DELGAIZO, CHRISTOPHER) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2019: #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form) (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEGLER v. ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRYL KEGLER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. DELGAIZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS, INC.
Represented By: TARA L. HUMMA
Represented By: BRIAN K. NAGATANI
Represented By: DENISE M. KEYSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNEOS HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: ALEXANDER NEMIROFF
Represented By: HARRY MATTHEW TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?