ADAMS COUNTY v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Plaintiff: ADAMS COUNTY
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, RICHARD S. SACKLER, ANDA, INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., MALLINCKRODT LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., BEVERLY SACKLER, MALLINCKRODT PLC, ACTAVIS, INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC., WAL-MART INC., ALLERGAN PLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THERESA SACKLER, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DAVID A. SACKLER, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, RITE AID CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., STUART D. BAKER, ACTAVIS, LLC, THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC., WALGREEN CO., CEPHALON, INC., MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER, MIAMI-LUKEN, INC., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WALGREEN EASTERN CO., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., HD SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., KATHE A. SACKLER, SPECGX LLC, JONATHAN D. SACKLER, NORAMCO, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE RAYMOND SACKLER FAMILY, PURDUE PHARMA INC., THE KROGER CO., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P. and PAR PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04438
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by ADAMS COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(SCATTON, BARRY)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT, BEVERLY SACKLER, DAVID A. SACKLER, JONATHAN D. SACKLER, KATHE A. SACKLER, MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER, RICHARD S. SACKLER, THERESA SACKLER, TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE RAYMOND SACKLER FAMILY of Bankruptcy Court Order Enjoining the Continuation of These Proceedings as to the Individual Former Directors (JASONS, CATHERINE)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF ADAMS COUNTY SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANT CVS HEALTH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS (DOC. NO. #8 ) BY 11/13/2019. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/5/2019. 11/6/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Adams County Court of Common Pleas and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2, #2 Certificate of Service)(VILLANUEVA, MARK)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CONOR B. O'CROININ, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #10 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/23/2019.10/24/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO CONOR O'CROININ WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN KENDALL on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(KENDALL, CAROLYN)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Adams County Court of Common Pleas filed by ADAMS COUNTY.Memorandum, Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(SCATTON, BARRY)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BARRY SCATTON on behalf of ADAMS COUNTY (SCATTON, BARRY)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Conor B. O'Croinin ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13870041.) filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(VILLANUEVA, MARK)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JAMES T. KITCHEN, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #6 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/15/2019.10/17/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(VILLANUEVA, MARK)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of James T. Kitchen ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13838469.) filed by WAL-MART INC..Affidavit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, KIMBERLY)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of DELAWARE County. (amas)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.(VILLANUEVA, MARK)
September 30, 2019 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WAL-MART INC.. (SEE DOCUMENT #4 FOR ATTACHMENT)(lvj, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Statement Disclosure Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WAL-MART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, KIMBERLY)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KIMBERLY A. BROWN on behalf of WAL-MART INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, KIMBERLY)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION of State Court Order Staying Defendants' Response Deadlines (VILLANUEVA, MARK)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION from Court of Common Pleas of Adams County, case number 2019-923. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 204179) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 3, #5 Exhibit 2 Part 4, #6 Exhibit 3)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAMS COUNTY v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: CAROLYN KENDALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD S. SACKLER
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEVERLY SACKLER
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART INC.
Represented By: KIMBERLY A. BROWN
Represented By: JAMES T. KITCHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA SACKLER
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID A. SACKLER
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART D. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIAMI-LUKEN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Represented By: MARK D. VILLANUEVA
Represented By: CONOR B. O'CROININ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN EASTERN CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHE A. SACKLER
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN D. SACKLER
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORAMCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE RAYMOND SACKLER FAMILY
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE KROGER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAMS COUNTY
Represented By: JOSEPH J. CAPPELLI
Represented By: BARRY SCATTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?