WEISHEW v. SAUL
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA A. WEISHEW
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv04465
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS RANDOMLY REASSIGNED TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA, DISTRICT JUDGE. SIGNED BY KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/21/19. 10/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by CHRISTINA A. WEISHEW.. (IMBESI, STEPHANIE)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney, Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kw, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Standing Procedural Order. 10/2/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (kw, )
October 1, 2019 (3) Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal on 10/2/19. (kw, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE U.S. MARSHAL FOR THE E.D. OF PA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES & COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH F.R.C.P. 4(i), ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 10/1/19.10/2/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(mbh, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint against ANDREW SAUL filed by CHRISTINA A. WEISHEW.(mbh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2019: #1 Civil Coversheets) (mbh, ).
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CHRISTINA A. WEISHEW.(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEISHEW v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA A. WEISHEW
Represented By: STEPHANIE M. IMBESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?