GREEN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: ADELA DELORES GREEN
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv04524
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney, Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kw, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Procedural Order 10/3/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (jl, ) Modified on 10/4/2019 (lisad, ).
October 3, 2019 3 IFP Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: U.S. MARSHAL on 10/3/19 (jl, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 10/3/19.10/3/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Magistrate Consent by ADELA DELORES GREEN.. (OSTERHOUT, KARL)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent to Assignment of SS Case)(fdc, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by ADELA DELORES GREEN. (IFP PENDING)(fdc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY ADELA DELORES GREEN.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADELA DELORES GREEN
Represented By: KARL E. OSTERHOUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?