CAMPUZANO v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: NATALIE JEAN CAMPUZANO
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv04551
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY R RICE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS DEEMED TO HAVE CONSENTED TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL EXERCISE JURISDICTION FOR ALL PURPOSES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/20/19. 11/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO FILE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS, ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/5/19. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT) 11/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATALIE JEAN CAMPUZANO served Summons and Complaint upon COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY by Mail. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt)(XANDER, SAMANTHA)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
October 2, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 10/02/2019 (bw, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Procedural Order 10/02/2019 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (bw, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(bw, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE204562.), filed by NATALIE JEAN CAMPUZANO.(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPUZANO v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATALIE JEAN CAMPUZANO
Represented By: SAMANTHA XANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?