SHEERON et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: MARTIN SHEERON, DIANE J. SHEERON and DETECTIVE MARTIN SHEERON
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA SHIP MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC., VIKING PUMP, INC., SPIRAX SARCO, INC., BRISTOL PENN JERSEY, INC., THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, GRINNELL LLC, FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C., GOULDS PUMPS LLC, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DAMIC CORPORATION, J.H FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY, FLOWSERVE US, INC. SOLEY AS SUCESSOR TO ALIAS : VOGT VALVE COMPANY, PENN JERSEY AUTO, INC., AURORA PUMP COMPANY, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, VELAN VALVE COPRORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., PHILADELPHIA SHIP REPAIR, LLC, COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, ITT LLC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO BELL & GOSSETT, PENN VALLEY ASSOCIATES, INC., PHILADELPHIA SHOP PRESERVATION GUILD, BW/IP, INC. AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES, BLACKMER, CROSBY VALVE, LLC, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., CATERPILLAR, INC., MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY, PHILADELPHIA SHIP SUPPLY, INC., MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY, WARREN PUMPS, LLC, PEPBOYS, CRANE CO., CBS CORPORATION, ATWOOD & MORRILL COMPANY, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., BW/IP, INC., FLOWSERVE US, INC., ITT LLC., BRISTOL PENN JERSEY, INC. doing business as PENN JERSEY AUTO, VIACOM, INC., DAMIC CORPORATION doing business as PENN JERSEY AUTO STORE #215, WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and PENN VALLEY ASSOCIATES, INC. doing business as PENN JERSEY STORES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04669
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Referring Judge: THOMAS J RUETER
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE by J.H FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY OF SERVICE OF EXPERT REPORT (JACKSON, DAMIAN)
October 20, 2020 Filing 126 Praecipe To Attach Exhibits to MSJ by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(SCHEETS, JOSHUA) Modified on 10/20/2020 (lisad, ).
October 19, 2020 Filing 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by VIKING PUMP, INC..with Proposed Order and Certificate of Service.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
October 19, 2020 Filing 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION.with Proposed Order and Certificate of Service.(HOWARTH, JOHN)
October 19, 2020 Filing 123 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
October 19, 2020 Filing 122 MOTION for Judgment filed by BW/IP, INC..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A and B)(TURLIK, JOHN)
October 19, 2020 Filing 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WARREN PUMPS, LLC.Certificate of Service, Memorandum of Law.(SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
October 19, 2020 Filing 120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AURORA PUMP COMPANY.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(HADDEN, JAMES)
October 19, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE by J.H FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY OF SERVICE OF EXPERT REPORTS (JACKSON, DAMIAN)
October 19, 2020 Filing 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by VELAN VALVE COPRORATION.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Errata C)(GREEN, NANCY)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY, LLC HAS AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 10/30/20 TO SERVE EXPERT REPORTS IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 10/19/20. 10/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY, LLC IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL, 10/26/20, TO FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE DEADLINE SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 11/23/20. DEFENDANT MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY, LLC'S REPLY TO THE RESPONSE DEADLINE SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 12/7/20. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 10/19/20. 10/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 19, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SPIRAX SARCO, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 19, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. OF SERVICE OF EXPERT REPORTS (TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 19, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE by SPIRAX SARCO, INC. OF SERVICE OF EXPERT REPORTS (TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 19, 2020 Filing 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ATWOOD & MORRILL COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(RAU, TIMOTHY)
October 19, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J.H FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(JACKSON, DAMIAN)
October 19, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CROSBY VALVE, LLC.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(KADISH, ERIC)
October 16, 2020 Filing 108 NOTICE by CROSBY VALVE, LLC OF SERVICE OF EXPERT LIABILITY REPORTS (KADISH, ERIC)
October 16, 2020 Filing 107 NOTICE by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION Statement Regarding Expert Witnesses (MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
October 16, 2020 Filing 106 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C. OF SERVICE OF EXPERT REPORTS (JACKSON, DAMIAN)
October 16, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BLOCK on behalf of VIKING PUMP, INC. with Certificate of Service(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
October 16, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. HOWARTH on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(HOWARTH, JOHN)
October 16, 2020 Filing 103 Witness List by AURORA PUMP COMPANY. Certificate of Service (HADDEN, JAMES)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINE SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 10/26/20, PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 11/23/20, FOSTER WHEELERS REPLY TO RESPONSES TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 12/7/20. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 10/16/20. 10/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
October 16, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BLACKMER.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
October 15, 2020 Filing 99 STIPULATION TO EXTEND SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINE by FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C.. (VALINIS, SUSAN) *FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 10/16/2020 (lisad, ).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ABOVE MATTER SHALL BE DISCONTINUED, WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO CATERPILLAR INC., AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/15/2020. 10/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ABOVE MATTER SHALL BE DISCONTINUED, WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO FLOWSERVE US INC., AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/15/2020. 10/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 96 STIPULATION of Dismissal by FLOWSERVE US, INC.. (LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)*FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 10/15/2020 (lisad, ).
October 14, 2020 Filing 95 STIPULATION of Dismissal by FLOWSERVE US, INC.. (LEVINTHAL, BERNARD) *RE-FILED AT DOC. #96 * Modified on 10/15/2020 (lisad, ).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, 3M COMPANY, HAS AN EXTENSION UNTIL NOVEMBER 16, 2020 TO SERVE DEFENDANT, 3M COMPANYS EXPERT REPORTS IN THIS MATTER.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 10/13/2020. 10/13/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY LLC HAS AN EXTENSION UNTIL 10/23/2020 TO SERVE DEFENDANT'S EXPERT REPORTS IN THIS MATTER.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 10/8/2020. 10/8/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Main Document 93 replaced on 10/13/2020) (kp, ).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY JOHN M. FITZPATRICK for FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C. IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/6/2020. 10/8/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 91 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John M. Fitzpatrick on behalf of Foster Wheeler, LLC by FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14613177.). (VALINIS, SUSAN)
October 2, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by KERRYANN M. COOK on behalf of THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY with Certificate of Service(COOK, KERRYANN)
September 29, 2020 Filing 89 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CATERPILLAR, INC.. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN) *FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 9/30/2020 (lisad, ).
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER THAT THE #87 MOTION TO MODIFY DEADLINES IS GRANTED AND THE DEADLINES ARE MODIFIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 9/16/2020.9/16/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION to Modify Deadlines (UNCONTESTED) filed by MARTIN SHEERON.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(EIDEN, FRANCIS)
September 10, 2020 Filing 86 Objections by CROSBY VALVE, LLC and Preliminary Statement with Certificate of Service. (KADISH, ERIC)
September 2, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE by MARTIN SHEERON of Corporate Representative Deposition of Crosby Valve, LLC. (EIDEN, FRANCIS)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE CASES OUTLINED HEREIN IS THE HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/27/2020. 8/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE DOC 9028 IN 01-MD-875)(kp, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by KERRYANN M. COOK on behalf of THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY (COOK, KERRYANN)
July 9, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KERRYANN M. COOK on behalf of THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY **(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY)** (COOK, KERRYANN) Modified on 7/10/2020 (tjd).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER THAT UNCONTESTED MOTION OF PLFFS TO MODIFY DEADLINES IS GRANTED AND THE FOLLOWING DEADLINES IN THIS CASE ARE MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS TO BE COMPLETED BY 9/15/2020. EXPERT DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS MUST BE COMPLETED BY 11/16/20. SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS MUST BE FILED BY 10/16/2020, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 7/6/20. 7/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION to Modify DEADLINES (UNCONTESTED) filed by DIANE J. SHEERON, MARTIN SHEERON.Brief.Motions referred to THOMAS J. RUETER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certification of Uncontested Motion, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(EIDEN, FRANCIS)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDERENTERED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 6/23/2020. 6/23/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for Protective Order filed by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY..Motions referred to THOMAS J. RUETER.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
June 15, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY M. ALEXANDER on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C. with Certificate of Service(ALEXANDER, TIFFANY)
May 5, 2020 Filing 76 Disclosure with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FLOWSERVE US, INC..(NUCCIO, MICHAEL)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: THE MOTION TO MODIFY DEADLINES IS GRANTED. EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/16/2020. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 10/19/2020. ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 5/4/2020. 5/4/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION to Modify Deadlines filed by FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C..Certificate of Service.Motions referred to THOMAS J. RUETER.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
April 21, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER N. SANTORO on behalf of PEPBOYS (SANTORO, CHRISTOPHER)
February 14, 2020 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER Pretrial Conference held on 2/14/2020. Court Reporter: ESR. (sg, ) Modified on 2/19/2020 (lisad, ).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SCHEDULING ORDER:EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/15/2020. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 10/15/2020. ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 2/14/2020. 2/18/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES P. HADDEN on behalf of AURORA PUMP COMPANY with Certificate of Service(HADDEN, JAMES)
February 7, 2020 Filing 69 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
February 6, 2020 Filing 68 Velan Valve ANSWER to Complaint Amended With Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Reply to Crossclaim against All Defendants by VELAN VALVE COPRORATION.(GREEN, NANCY)
February 3, 2020 Filing 67 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with Certificate of Service by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION.(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
February 3, 2020 Filing 66 Defendant Industrial Holdings Corporation f/k/a The Carborundum Company's ANSWER to Complaint , Affiirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Replies to Cross-Claims to Plaintiff's Complaint against All Plaintiffs by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION(ALIAS: INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCSSOR IN INTEREST TO CARABORUNDUM).(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
February 3, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY on behalf of INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION(ALIAS: INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCSSOR IN INTEREST TO CARABORUNDUM) with Certificate of Service(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
February 3, 2020 Filing 64 ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by FLOWSERVE US, INC..(NUCCIO, MICHAEL)
January 29, 2020 Filing 63 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C..(VALINIS, SUSAN)
January 29, 2020 Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSS CLAIMS against All Defendants by FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C..(VALINIS, SUSAN)
January 28, 2020 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint with affirmative defenses, answer to all crossclaims, jury demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BW/IP, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
January 28, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, LLC (RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 28, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of ATWOOD & MORRILL COMPANY (RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 2/14/2020 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3C BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 1/24/2020. 1/24/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 57 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER)
January 23, 2020 Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims and Reply to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER)
January 23, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J. NEESON on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(NEESON, PETER)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER THAT THE COURT REFERS THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER FOR PROCEEDINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/21/2020. 1/22/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 53 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by CATERPILLAR, INC..(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
December 3, 2019 Filing 52 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CATERPILLAR, INC..(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by CARRIER CORPORATION of Service of Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Request for Production Directed to Carrier Corporation (STOKES, GREGORY)
December 2, 2019 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CROSBY VALVE, LLC.(KADISH, ERIC)
November 22, 2019 Filing 49 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sarco International Corporation by SPIRAX SARCO, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
November 22, 2019 Filing 48 Disclosure by SPIRAX SARCO, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
November 22, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SPIRAX SARCO, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
November 22, 2019 Filing 46 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Electrolux Holdings, Inc. by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
November 22, 2019 Filing 45 Disclosure by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
November 22, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
November 15, 2019 Filing 43 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 41 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
November 14, 2019 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
November 14, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
November 14, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART R. SINGER on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. with Certificate of Service(SINGER, STEWART)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS ASSERTED HEREIN, BY AND IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS AGAINST DEFENDANT PHILADELPHIA SHIP REPAIR, LLC AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/13/2019. 11/14/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN JACKSON on behalf of J.H FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY with Certificate of Service(JACKSON, DAMIAN)
October 31, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK T. FINNEGAN on behalf of THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY with Certificate of Service(FINNEGAN, PATRICK)
October 30, 2019 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARRIER CORPORATION.(STOKES, GREGORY)
October 30, 2019 Filing 34 CARRIER CORPORATION'S ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CARRIER CORPORATION.(STOKES, GREGORY)
October 30, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY M. STOKES on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(STOKES, GREGORY)
October 30, 2019 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 31 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE CO. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BRUCH, G.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of BLACKMER (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
October 28, 2019 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT Inc. with Certificate of Service by ITT LLC..(ARTHUR, AARON)
October 28, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ARTHUR on behalf of ITT LLC. with Certificate of Service(ARTHUR, AARON)
October 28, 2019 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Johnson Controls International plc with Certificate of Service by GRINNELL LLC.(ARTHUR, AARON)
October 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ARTHUR on behalf of GRINNELL LLC with Certificate of Service(ARTHUR, AARON)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT, Inc. with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMPS LLC.(ARTHUR, AARON)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ARTHUR on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS LLC with Certificate of Service(ARTHUR, AARON)
October 23, 2019 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY.(MULLANEY, THERESA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MULLANEY, THERESA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and IMO Holdings, Inc. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by VELAN VALVE COPRORATION.(GREEN, NANCY)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY D. GREEN on behalf of VELAN VALVE COPRORATION with Certificate of Service(GREEN, NANCY)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of BLACKMER (RYAN, DANIEL)
October 18, 2019 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C. *FOR PDF SEE DOC. #13 * (lisad, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by INGRID H. GRAFF on behalf of COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC (GRAFF, INGRID)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C..(VALINIS, SUSAN)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BW/IP, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CROSBY VALVE, LLC.(KADISH, ERIC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of CROSBY VALVE, LLC with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including FLOWSERVE CORPORATION with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FLOWSERVE US, INC..(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL on behalf of FLOWSERVE US, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE M. PITT on behalf of FLOWSERVE US, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(PITT, TERENCE)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims and Reply to Cross-Claims , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THERESA M. MULLANEY on behalf of MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY (MULLANEY, THERESA)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP, INC.(TURLIK, JOHN) Modified on 10/10/2019 (lisad, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 1909018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 204937) (Attachments: #1 TRACK FORM, #2 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 DESIGNATION FORM)(sg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHEERON et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA SHIP MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIKING PUMP, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO, INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL PENN JERSEY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY
Represented By: PATRICK T. FINNEGAN
Represented By: KERRYANN M. COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC
Represented By: AARON ARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C.
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Represented By: TIFFANY M. ALEXANDER
Represented By: JOHN M. FITZPATRICK
Represented By: DAMIAN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS LLC
Represented By: AARON ARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN S. HOWARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAMIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Represented By: DAMIAN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC. SOLEY AS SUCESSOR TO ALIAS : VOGT VALVE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENN JERSEY AUTO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES P. HADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE COPRORATION
Represented By: NANCY D. GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA SHIP REPAIR, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY M. PYPCZNSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC
Represented By: INGRID H. GRAFF
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: PETER J. NEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: GREGORY M. STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO BELL & GOSSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENN VALLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA SHOP PRESERVATION GUILD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC. AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKMER
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROSBY VALVE, LLC
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: STEWART R. SINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA SHIP SUPPLY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY
Represented By: THERESA M. MULLANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SCHEETS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEPBOYS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER N. SANTORO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATWOOD & MORRILL COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC.
Represented By: BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL
Represented By: TERENCE M. PITT
Represented By: MICHAEL J. NUCCIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC.
Represented By: AARON ARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL PENN JERSEY, INC. doing business as PENN JERSEY AUTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAMIC CORPORATION doing business as PENN JERSEY AUTO STORE #215
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENN VALLEY ASSOCIATES, INC. doing business as PENN JERSEY STORES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN SHEERON
Represented By: FRANCIS A. EIDEN
Represented By: LEONARD F FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE J. SHEERON
Represented By: FRANCIS A. EIDEN
Represented By: LEONARD F FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DETECTIVE MARTIN SHEERON
Represented By: FRANCIS A. EIDEN
Represented By: LEONARD F FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?