SURMAN et al v. PAYNE
Plaintiff: NICHOLINA SURMAN and STEPHEN SURMAN, H/W
Defendant: ROBERT PAYNE and DOT TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04695
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION by DOT TRANSPORTATION, INC., ROBERT PAYNE. (HERSPERGER, STEPHANIE)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer filed by DOT TRANSPORTATION, INC., ROBERT PAYNE.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion to Transfer Venue, #4 Brief Brief In Support of Motion to Transfer Venue)(HERSPERGER, STEPHANIE)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NICHOLINA SURMAN, STEPHEN SURMAN, H/W. DOT TRANSPORTATION, INC. waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (RIECHELSON, KEVIN)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DOT Transportation Inc. on 10/16/2019 by NICHOLINA SURMAN, STEPHEN SURMAN, H/W. Waiver of Service due by 12/5/2019.**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY USING INCORRECT EVENT, REFILED AT DOCUMENT #5 )** (RIECHELSON, KEVIN) Modified on 11/6/2019 (tjd).
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE L. HERSPERGER on behalf of DOT TRANSPORTATION, INC., ROBERT PAYNE with JURY DEMAND AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(HERSPERGER, STEPHANIE)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN T. PION on behalf of DOT TRANSPORTATION, INC., ROBERT PAYNE with JURY DEMAND AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(PION, JOHN)
October 9, 2019 2 Summons Issued as to DOT TRANSPORTATION, INC., ROBERT PAYNE. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 10/9/2019 (bw, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOT TRANSPORTATION, INC., ROBERT PAYNE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE204990.), filed by NICHOLINA SURMAN, STEPHEN SURMAN, H/W. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, # Modified on 10/10/2019 (bw, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: # 4 Case Management Track Form) (bw, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #3 Case Management Track Form) (bw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SURMAN et al v. PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLINA SURMAN
Represented By: KEVIN S. RIECHELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN SURMAN, H/W
Represented By: KEVIN S. RIECHELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT PAYNE
Represented By: STEPHANIE L. HERSPERGER
Represented By: JOHN T. PION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOT TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: STEPHANIE L. HERSPERGER
Represented By: JOHN T. PION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?