ETZWEILER v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS GLENN ETZWEILER
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC. and AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04736
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by THOMAS GLENN ETZWEILER. (LEASE, ADAM)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/9/2020 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND.(rt)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC..(FEENEY, BRIAN)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTIANA L. SIGNS on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SIGNS, CHRISTIANA)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/22/2019. 10/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. LEASE on behalf of THOMAS GLENN ETZWEILER (LEASE, ADAM)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC..(kw, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT AMAZON.COM, INC..(kw, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County, PA, Certificate of Service, case number 2019-22318. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE205102)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ETZWEILER v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS GLENN ETZWEILER
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Represented By: ADAM C. LEASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN T. FEENEY
Represented By: CHRISTIANA L. SIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN T. FEENEY
Represented By: CHRISTIANA L. SIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?