TAYLOR v. BOROUGH OF NORRISTOWN et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS ANTHONY TAYLOR
Defendant: OFFICER SEAN GALLAGHER, JOHN DOE, BOROUGH OF NORRISTOWN and OFFICER DARREN BUCKWALTER
Case Number: 2:2019cv04830
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by THOMAS ANTHONY TAYLOR. (MESSING, PAUL)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, 12/17/19 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT VIA TELEPHONE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 12/6/19. 12/6/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by BOROUGH OF NORRISTOWN, OFFICER DARREN BUCKWALTER, OFFICER SEAN GALLAGHER.(DIDOMENICIS, ROBERT)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MAY FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 12/6/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 11/21/19. 11/21/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS on behalf of BOROUGH OF NORRISTOWN, OFFICER DARREN BUCKWALTER, OFFICER SEAN GALLAGHER with Jury Demand and Cert of Service(DIDOMENICIS, ROBERT)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS ANTHONY TAYLOR re: Michael Doyle served Summons and Complaint upon OFFICER SEAN GALLAGHER by Designated Agent. OFFICER SEAN GALLAGHER served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (MESSING, PAUL)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS ANTHONY TAYLOR re: Michael Doyle served Summons and Complaint upon OFFICER DARREN BUCKWALTER by Designated Agent. OFFICER DARREN BUCKWALTER served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (MESSING, PAUL)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS ANTHONY TAYLOR re: Michael Doyle served Summons and Complaint upon BOROUGH OF NORRISTOWN by Designated Agent. BOROUGH OF NORRISTOWN served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (MESSING, PAUL)
October 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by THOMAS ANTHONY TAYLOR. (jl, )
October 17, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to BOROUGH OF NORRISTOWN, OFFICER DARREN BUCKWALTER, OFFICER SEAN GALLAGHER. Forwarded To: PAUL MESSING on 10/17/19 (jl, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF NORRISTOWN, JOHN DOE, OFFICER DARREN BUCKWALTER, OFFICER SEAN GALLAGHER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE205338.), filed by THOMAS ANTHONY TAYLOR, JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. BOROUGH OF NORRISTOWN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER SEAN GALLAGHER
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF NORRISTOWN
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER DARREN BUCKWALTER
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS ANTHONY TAYLOR
Represented By: PAUL M. MESSING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?