ROGERS v. MONTGOMERY COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL F. ROGERS
Defendant: ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY, SHERRI JONES, LIEUTENANT DAVID MONTEITH, MONTGOMERY COUNTY, JUDITH MCILHORNE, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER DAVID SLAYMAKER, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GREGORY FERRELL, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER THOMAS STIMSON, ALBERT EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER - MONTGOMERY, ALBERT EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JOHN DOES 1-10, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC., SERGEANT EDWARD KEEFER, DR. MARGARET CARILLO, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JAMES MEEHAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ANTHONY STEVENSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER VICTORIA BARATUCCI, CLAUDETTE FOSTER, CORPORAL SEAN LEHMAN, CORPORAL TYRA IZZARD, EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MELVIN HOFFMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRIAN CHRISTY, THOMAS REESE, MEDICAL JOHN DOES 1-10 and DR. MARGARET CARRILLO
Case Number: 2:2019cv04921
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON Pretrial Conference held on 12/19/2019. (nd, )
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED BY 1/15/2020; THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE DISCOVERY BY 7/31/2020. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE TO BE FILED BY 8/14/2020. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR PURPOSES OF CONDUCTING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS, AS JUDGE HEY DEEMS APPROPRIATE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/19/19. 12/19/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,)
December 18, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint,,, by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY.(FAY, KEVIN)
December 17, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CORPORAL SEAN LEHMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ANTHONY STEVENSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRIAN CHRISTY, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER DAVID SLAYMAKER, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GREGORY FERRELL, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JAMES MEEHAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MELVIN HOFFMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER THOMAS STIMSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER VICTORIA BARATUCCI, LIEUTENANT DAVID MONTEITH, MONTGOMERY COUNTY, SERGEANT EDWARD KEEFER.Proposed Order, Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(NEWCOMER, PHILIP)
December 12, 2019 Filing 29 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Philip W. Newcomer, Esq. Re: accepted summons and complaint for CORRECTIONAL OFFICER DAVID SLAYMAKER on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (BURKE, COLIN)
December 12, 2019 Filing 28 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Philip W. Newcomer, Esq. Re: accepted summons and complaint for CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRIAN CHRISTY on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (BURKE, COLIN)
December 11, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses by MARGARET CARRILLO, CLAUDETTE FOSTER, SHERRI JONES, JUDITH MCILHORNE, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC., THOMAS REESE.(NINOSKY, JOHN)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT MONTGOMERY COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 21) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/5/19. 12/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 4, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRIAN CHRISTY and CORPORAL TYRA IZZARD forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 12/4/19. (rf, ) Modified on 12/5/2019 (rf, ).
December 4, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, MARGARET CARRILLO, CORPORAL SEAN LEHMAN, CORPORAL TYRA IZZARD, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ANTHONY STEVENSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRIAN CHRISTY, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER DAVID SLAYMAKER, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GREGORY FERRELL, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JAMES MEEHAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JOHN DOES 1-10, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MELVIN HOFFMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER THOMAS STIMSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER VICTORIA BARATUCCI, EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY, CLAUDETTE FOSTER, SHERRI JONES, LIEUTENANT DAVID MONTEITH, JUDITH MCILHORNE, MEDICAL JOHN DOES 1-10, MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC., THOMAS REESE, SERGEANT EDWARD KEEFER, filed by MICHAEL F. ROGERS., JURY TRIAL DEMAND, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rf, )
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ARE TO APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR DECEMBER 19, 2019 AT 11:00 AM IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 3809, BEFORE HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 11/21/19. 11/21/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,)
November 21, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, together with with Affirmative Defenses by MARGARET CARRILLO, CLAUDETTE FOSTER, SHERRI JONES, JUDITH MCILHORNE, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC., THOMAS REESE.(NINOSKY, JOHN)
November 21, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN O. PHILLIPS on behalf of CORPORAL SEAN LEHMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ANTHONY STEVENSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER DAVID SLAYMAKER, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GREGORY FERRELL, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JAMES MEEHAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MELVIN HOFFMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER THOMAS STIMSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER VICTORIA BARATUCCI, LIEUTENANT DAVID MONTEITH, MONTGOMERY COUNTY, SERGEANT EDWARD KEEFER (PHILLIPS, BRIAN)
November 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CORPORAL SEAN LEHMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ANTHONY STEVENSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER DAVID SLAYMAKER, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GREGORY FERRELL, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JAMES MEEHAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MELVIN HOFFMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER THOMAS STIMSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER VICTORIA BARATUCCI, LIEUTENANT DAVID MONTEITH, MONTGOMERY COUNTY, SERGEANT EDWARD KEEFER.Proposed Order, Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(NEWCOMER, PHILIP)
November 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD J. BROOKS, JR on behalf of ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BROOKS, DONALD)
November 20, 2019 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Albert Einstein Medical Center by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.(FAY, KEVIN)
November 20, 2019 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY.(FAY, KEVIN)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY.(FAY, KEVIN)
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN WILLIAM FAY on behalf of ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(FAY, KEVIN) Modified on 12/4/2019 (md).
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC..(NINOSKY, JOHN)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN R. NINOSKY on behalf of MARGARET CARRILLO, CLAUDETTE FOSTER, SHERRI JONES, JUDITH MCILHORNE, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC., THOMAS REESE with Certificate of Service(NINOSKY, JOHN)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Returned Executed re: Terry Bamgardner served Summons and Complaint upon MARGARET CARRILLO, CLAUDETTE FOSTER, SHERRI JONES, JUDITH MCILHORNE, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC., THOMAS REESE by Personal Service on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (mbh, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Executed re: James G. Robinson served Summons and Complaint upon CORPORAL SEAN LEHMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER VICTORIA BARATUCCI and SERGEANT EDWARD KEEFER by Personal Service on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (mbh, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL F. ROGERS re: James G. Robinson served Summons and Complaint upon ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ANTHONY STEVENSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GREGORY FERRELL, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JAMES MEEHAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MELVIN HOFFMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER THOMAS STIMSON, EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY and LIEUTENANT DAVID MONTEITH, MONTGOMERY COUNTY by Personal Service on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (mbh, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by MICHAEL F. ROGERS as to CORPORAL TYRA IZZARD, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRIAN CHRISTY and CORRECTIONAL OFFICER DAVID SLAYMAKER. (mbh, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant Einstein Medical Center Montgomery by COLIN BURKE on behalf of MICHAEL F. ROGERS(BURKE, COLIN)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant Albert Einstein Healthcare Network by COLIN BURKE on behalf of MICHAEL F. ROGERS(BURKE, COLIN)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant Dr. Margaret Carrillo by COLIN BURKE on behalf of MICHAEL F. ROGERS(BURKE, COLIN)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant Sherri Jones, MA by COLIN BURKE on behalf of MICHAEL F. ROGERS(BURKE, COLIN)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant Judith McIlhorne, RN by COLIN BURKE on behalf of MICHAEL F. ROGERS(BURKE, COLIN)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant Thomas Reese, RN by COLIN BURKE on behalf of MICHAEL F. ROGERS(BURKE, COLIN)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant Claudette Foster, RN by COLIN BURKE on behalf of MICHAEL F. ROGERS(BURKE, COLIN)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant PrimeCare Medical, Inc. by COLIN BURKE on behalf of MICHAEL F. ROGERS(BURKE, COLIN)
October 22, 2019 21 Summons Issued as to ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, MARGARET CARILLO, CORPORAL SEAN LEHMAN, CORPORAL TYRA IZZARD, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ANTHONY STEVENSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRIAN CHRISTY, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER DAVID SLAYMAKER, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GREGORY FERRELL, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JAMES MEEHAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MELVIN HOFFMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER THOMAS STIMSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER VICTORIA BARATUCCI, EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY, CLAUDETTE FOSTER, SHERRI JONES, LIEUTENANT DAVID MONTEITH, JUDITH MCILHORNE, MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC., THOMAS REESE, SERGEANT EDWARD KEEFER. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 10/22/2019 (bw, )
October 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MICHAEL F. ROGERS. (bw, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, MARGARET CARRILLO, CORPORAL SEAN LEHMAN, CORPORAL TYRA IZZARD, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ANTHONY STEVENSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRIAN CHRISTY, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER DAVID SLAYMAKER, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GREGORY FERRELL, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JAMES MEEHAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JOHN DOES 1-10, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MELVIN HOFFMAN, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER THOMAS STIMSON, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER VICTORIA BARATUCCI, EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY, CLAUDETTE FOSTER, SHERRI JONES, LIEUTENANT DAVID MONTEITH, JUDITH MCILHORNE, MEDICAL JOHN DOES 1-10, MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC., THOMAS REESE, SERGEANT EDWARD KEEFER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE205546.), filed by MICHAEL F. ROGERS.(bw, ) Modified on 10/29/2019 (md).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROGERS v. MONTGOMERY COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK
Represented By: KEVIN WILLIAM FAY
Represented By: DONALD J. BROOKS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY
Represented By: KEVIN WILLIAM FAY
Represented By: DONALD J. BROOKS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERRI JONES
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT DAVID MONTEITH
Represented By: BRIAN O. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTGOMERY COUNTY
Represented By: BRIAN O. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDITH MCILHORNE
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER DAVID SLAYMAKER
Represented By: BRIAN O. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GREGORY FERRELL
Represented By: BRIAN O. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER THOMAS STIMSON
Represented By: BRIAN O. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER - MONTGOMERY
Represented By: KEVIN WILLIAM FAY
Represented By: DONALD J. BROOKS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER MONTGOMERY
Represented By: KEVIN WILLIAM FAY
Represented By: DONALD J. BROOKS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC.
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT EDWARD KEEFER
Represented By: BRIAN O. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. MARGARET CARILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JAMES MEEHAN
Represented By: BRIAN O. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ANTHONY STEVENSON
Represented By: BRIAN O. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER VICTORIA BARATUCCI
Represented By: BRIAN O. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAUDETTE FOSTER
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORAL SEAN LEHMAN
Represented By: BRIAN O. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORAL TYRA IZZARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK
Represented By: KEVIN WILLIAM FAY
Represented By: DONALD J. BROOKS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MELVIN HOFFMAN
Represented By: BRIAN O. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRIAN CHRISTY
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS REESE
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. MARGARET CARRILLO
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL F. ROGERS
Represented By: COLIN BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?