MATHIS v. MCGARRITY et al
Plaintiff: DERRICK MATHIS
Defendant: MICHELLE HINES and JAMES MCGARRITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv04933
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by DERRICK MATHIS. *NO ENVELOPE PROVIDED. (jaa, ) Modified on 12/19/2019 (jaa, ).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED IN EACH OF THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUFFICIENT FINANCIAL INFORMATION TO ALLOW THE COURT TO DETERMINE WHETHER HE HAS THE MEANS TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLAINTIFF AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IN BOTH CASES, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF EACH CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/2/19.12/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF WITH FORMS.(jaa, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by MICHELLE HINES under Chapter Number 13 of the Bankruptcy Code in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Eastern Pennslyvania filed under case number 19-16297 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Bankruptcy)(MCGARRITY, JAMES)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (dmc, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against MICHELLE HINES, JAMES MCGARRITY, filed by DERRICK MATHIS. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form). NO ENVELOPE.(dmc, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DERRICK MATHIS..(dmc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATHIS v. MCGARRITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE HINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MCGARRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK MATHIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?