NIEDERREITER GMBH AUSTRIA v. DEVON MEDICAL INC.
Petitioner: NIEDERREITER GMBH AUSTRIA
Respondent: DEVON MEDICAL INC.
In Re: IN THE MATTER OF THE APPLICATION OF
Case Number: 2:2019cv05039
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated Order 12/03/2019 (Document #8 ) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to James G. McCarney for the following reason: Insufficient Address. (nd, )
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED ON DECEMBER 3, 2019 #8 IS VACATED AS PREMATURE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/11/2019. 12/11/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 ***VACATED PER #9 *** ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PETITIONER AND AGAINST RESPONDENT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/4/2019. 12/4/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nds)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION TO ADMIT JAMES G. MCCARNEY #5 IS GRANTED AND MR. MCCARNEY IS HEREBY ADMITTED AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF NIEDERREITER GMBH AUSTRIA, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/18/2019. 11/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO MR. MCCARNEY ALONG WITH AN ECF REGISTRATION APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(nds)
November 15, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to DEVON MEDICAL INC.. Forwarded To: PETITIONERS COUNSEL on 11/18/2019. (sg, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Praecipe to Reinstate Summons by NIEDERREITER GMBH AUSTRIA. (MCELHATTON, DANIEL) Modified on 11/18/2019 (lisad, ).
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James G. McCarney by NIEDERREITER GMBH AUSTRIA.. (MCELHATTON, DANIEL) FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 207131. Modified on 11/20/2019 (sg, ).
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum Support of Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award by NIEDERREITER GMBH AUSTRIA. (MCELHATTON, DANIEL)
October 31, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to DEVON MEDICAL INC.. Forwarded To: PETITIONERS COUNSEL on 11/5/2019 (sg, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Amended #1 Application/Petition Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award filed by NIEDERREITER GMBH AUSTRIA.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Summons)(MCELHATTON, DANIEL) Modified on 11/1/2019 (lisad, ).
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NIEDERREITER GMBH AUSTRIA.(fdc, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award filed by NIEDERREITER GMBH AUSTRIA. (Receipt #205873) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NIEDERREITER GMBH AUSTRIA v. DEVON MEDICAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IN THE MATTER OF THE APPLICATION OF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NIEDERREITER GMBH AUSTRIA
Represented By: DANIEL P. MCELHATTON
Represented By: JAMES G. MCCARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DEVON MEDICAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?