United HealthCare Services, Inc. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al DO NOT DOCKET. CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED OUT.
Plaintiff: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, MYLAN N.V, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., Actavis Holdco US, Inc., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, APOTEX CORP., MYLAN INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA, UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ INC, VERSAPHARM, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. and Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05042
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02696. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) transferring case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Cynthia M. Rufe. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Re-issued as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC, Versapharm, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Re-issued as to Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA, Lannett Company, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Re-issued as to Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Holdco US, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Apotex Corp., Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Camber Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Endo International plc. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT DUE TO CASE ASSIGNMENT ERROR. This case is reassigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung from the Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2696 (JNE/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC, Versapharm, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA, Lannett Company, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Holdco US, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Apotex Corp., Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Camber Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Endo International plc. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2696 (PJS/TNL). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Hamish P.M. Hume, Abby L. Dennis, Kyle Smith, Duane L. Loft, Judith A. Zahid, Eric W. Buetzow, James R. Martin, Jennifer Duncan Hackett as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated is a corporate parent of Plaintiff United HealthCare Services, Inc.. (Zamansky, Rory) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7204368) filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zamansky, Rory) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United HealthCare Services, Inc. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al DO NOT DOCKET. CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED OUT.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Holdco US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERSAPHARM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: RORY D. ZAMANSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?