SIMONS v. BROWN et al
Petitioner: ALAN SIMONS
Respondent: LORRAINE BROWN and JOHN BROWN
Case Number: 2:2019cv05074
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PETITIONER SHALL SUBMIT HIS AFFIDAVIT AND ANY ACCOMPANYING BRIEFING TO THE COURT NO LATER THAN 1/3/2020, AND RESPONDENTS SHALL PROVIDE ANY RESPONSE TO THAT SUBMISSION NO LATER THAN 1/17/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 12/13/2019. 12/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Reply Memorandum of Law Supporting re #2 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award and Opposition to Cross-Motion to Confirm filed by ALAN SIMONS. Certificate of Service. (BOCHETTO, GEORGE) Modified on 11/26/2019 (lisad, ).
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. O'CONNELL on behalf of ALAN SIMONS with Certificate of Service(O'CONNELL, JOHN)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 Response to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Order by JOHN BROWN, LORRAINE BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (MILLS, CRAIG)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Opposition re #2 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award, CROSS-MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by JOHN BROWN, LORRAINE BROWN. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew G. Hope, #2 Exhibits 1-14)(MILLS, CRAIG) Modified on 11/12/2019 (lisad, ).
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG DOUGLAS MILLS on behalf of JOHN BROWN, LORRAINE BROWN with Certificate of Service(MILLS, CRAIG)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Timothy Weldon re: served Summons, Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award upon Lorraine Brown on her own behalf and on behalf of John Brown by Personal Service on 10/31/2019 (O'CONNELL, JOHN)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by ALAN SIMONS.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
October 29, 2019 2 Summons Issued as to JOHN BROWN, LORRAINE BROWN. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 10/30/19 (jaa, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION ORDER by ALAN SIMONS. (Attachments: #1 PART 2, #2 PART 3, #3 PART 4, #4 Case Management Track Form)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMONS v. BROWN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALAN SIMONS
Represented By: GEORGE BOCHETTO
Represented By: JOHN A. O'CONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LORRAINE BROWN
Represented By: CRAIG DOUGLAS MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN BROWN
Represented By: CRAIG DOUGLAS MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?