WILES v. SAUL
Plaintiff: LAVETTE WILES
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv05154
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Referring Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/6/19. 11/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS TO HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/6/19. 11/6/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Social Security Standing Procedural Order 11/6/2019 Entered and copies e-mailed. (amas)
November 5, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded 2 COPIES TO THE US MARSHALS AND 1 TO THE US ATTY on 11/6/2019 (amas)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE US MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT AT THE FOLLOWING ADDRESSES OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE US ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 11/5/2019.11/6/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by LAVETTE WILES.. (WEISBORD, RICHARD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(amas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by LAVETTE WILES.(amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM) (amas, ).
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by LAVETTE WILES.MEMORANDUM.(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILES v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAVETTE WILES
Represented By: RICHARD A. WEISBORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?