CRAWFORD v. SAUL
Plaintiff: MICHELLE CANDANCE CRAWFORD and MICHELLE CANDACE CRAWFORD
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv05156
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JACOB P HART
Referring Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service re: U.S. Marshal Service served Summons and Complaint upon Social Security Administration and U.S. Attorney General by Personal Service on 11/12/19 (mbh, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (mbh, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 Procedural Order 11/6/29 Entered and copies e-mailed. (mbh, )
November 6, 2019 (3) Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (2) forwarded to the U.S. Marshal Service on 11/6/29 and (1) given to the U.S. Attorney. (mbh, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE COMPLAINT IS TO BE FILED AND SUMMONS ARE TO BE ISSUED. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON THE DEFENDANT AT NO COST TO THE PLAINTIFF. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 11/5/19. 11/6/29 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART TO HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/6/19. 11/6/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by MICHELLE CANDACE CRAWFORD.. (WEISBORD, RICHARD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(jl, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by MICHELLE CANDACE CRAWFORD. (IFP PENDING)(jl, ) Modified on 11/5/2019 (md).
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 MICHELLE CANDACE CRAWFORD MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, MEMORANDUM..(jl, ) Modified on 11/5/2019 (md).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRAWFORD v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE CANDANCE CRAWFORD
Represented By: RICHARD A. WEISBORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE CANDACE CRAWFORD
Represented By: RICHARD A. WEISBORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?